NORTH JERSEY BRAIN & SPINE CENTER v. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NORTH JERSEY BRAIN & SPINE CENTER
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NY), INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC., OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE CO., BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., ABC CORPS. 1-100, LOEWS HOTELS & RESORT CORP., AXA ASSISTANCE USA, INC. and FAIRLEIGH DICKINSON UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 2:2018cv15631
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant that the date by which Defendants must answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including January 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/19/2018. (sms)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Eric D. Katz, Esq. to Honorable Leda Dunn Wettre, U.S.M.J. enclosing a Consent Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. (KATZ, ERIC)
November 7, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE CO., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NY), INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/23/2018. (sms)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
November 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC., OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NY), INC. from Superior Court of Essex County, case number ESX-L-5818-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9145255), filed by OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC., OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NY), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MANNING, FRANCIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTH JERSEY BRAIN & SPINE CENTER v. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NY), INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN MOORE & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOEWS HOTELS & RESORT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA ASSISTANCE USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRLEIGH DICKINSON UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH JERSEY BRAIN & SPINE CENTER
Represented By: ERIC D. KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?