WORTMANN et al v. LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARK WORTMANN and JOSE RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC., MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC and PAUL RITTER
Case Number: 2:2018cv16128
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER, that Defendants be permitted to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by 2/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/21/2018. (JB, )
December 21, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #11 Order submitted by MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC, LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC., PAUL RITTER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/26/2019. (JB, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Suna Lee. (LEE, SUNA)
December 13, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC, LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC., PAUL RITTER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/26/2018. (JB, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Suna Lee)(LEE, SUNA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC identifying Morristown as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC., MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC, PAUL RITTER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Suna Lee)(LEE, SUNA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SUNA LEE on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Suna Lee)(LEE, SUNA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK WORTMANN, JOSE RODRIGUEZ. PAUL RITTER served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (BROWN, JASON)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK WORTMANN, JOSE RODRIGUEZ. MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (BROWN, JASON)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK WORTMANN, JOSE RODRIGUEZ. LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC. served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (BROWN, JASON)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC., MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC, PAUL RITTER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (fp, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC., MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC, PAUL RITTER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9170336) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARK WORTMANN, JOSE RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form - Mark Wortmann, #2 Exhibit B: Consent Form - Jose Rodriguez, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons)(BROWN, JASON)
November 14, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Do not add addresses when adding parties; select the name if it is already in the database without creating a new one . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr, )
November 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORTMANN et al v. LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK WORTMANN
Represented By: JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIVINGSTON AUTO WASH, INC.
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRISTOWN CAR WASH, LLC
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL RITTER
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?