HARVE v RODRIGUEZ, et al
Petitioner: GLENNIS HARVE
Respondent: MARK GIANNANTONIO, JOHN TSOUKARIS, RONALD D VITIELLO, DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ and MATTHEW G WHITAKER
Case Number: 2:2018cv16439
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW ANTHONY JOHNSON on behalf of GLENNIS HARVE (JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Counsel for the United States. (DAUENHEIMER, DAVID)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: On November 29, 2018, I ordered the government to respond within 45 days to the habeas petition challenging Mr. Harve's prolonged detention by ICE. On December 27, 2018 (clarified January 4, 2019), Judge Linares entered Standing Order 18-4, staying certain civil matters during the partial government shutdown, subject to relief by motion. Petitioner has filed such a motion (DE 11) for relief from the stay. Whether or not I receive a response to that motion on or before the date a response is due, I will necessarily rule on it. So Ordered by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/14/19. (nic, )
January 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION Relief From Stay and Order for Respondents to Answer . Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Relief From Stay and Order for Respondents to Answer by GLENNIS HARVE. (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter-brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)
January 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received for LAUREN MAJOR: $ 150, receipt number NEW038280 (mfr)
December 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Lauren Major $ 150, receipt number NEW038280 (JB, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for MARK GIANNANTONIO,ENES HAJDARPASIC for KIRSTJEN NIELSEN,ENES HAJDARPASIC for ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ,ENES HAJDARPASIC for JOHN TSOUKARIS,ENES HAJDARPASIC for RONALD D VITIELLO,ENES HAJDARPASIC for MATTHEW G WHITAKER added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GLENNIS HARVE - DECLARATION OF LARUEN MAJOR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PHV (BOAZ, MATTHEW)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO ANSWER that Count Two and any other portions of the petition concerning a transfer or a threat of retaliatory transfer of Petitioner to another facility are Dismissed Without Prejudice; the Clerk shall serve copies of the petition and this Order upon Respondents by regular mail, with all costs of service advanced by the United States; the Clerk shall forward a copy of the petition and this Order to the Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office at the following email address: USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov; Respondents shall file and serve an answer within 45 days of the entry of this Order; within 45 days of receipt of the answer, Petitioner may file a reply to the answer; within 7 days of Petitioner's release, by parole or otherwise, as well as any change in the basis for Petitioner's immigration detention, Respondents shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk; Respondents' motion for an order to show cause and for a temporary restraining order #6 is Denied. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/29/2018. (sm)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER admitting Lauren Major, Esq. pro hac vice; shall pay the annual fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court within 20 days from the entry of this Order; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/29/2018. (sm)
November 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE was not submitted with #6 MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE submitted by MATTHEW BOAZ on 11/27/2018. PLEASE SUBMIT THE MISSING DOCUMENT(S) ONLY. (dam, )
November 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action modified to 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam, )
November 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 "DECLARATION OF LAUREN MAJOR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PHV" submitted by on MATTHEW BOAZ contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. Pursuant to Local Rule 101.1 (4), only an attorney of law of this Court may file papers, enter appearances for parties, sign stipulations, or sign and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by GLENNIS HARVE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Attorney declaration of notice)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by GLENNIS HARVE re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (BOAZ, MATTHEW)
November 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty. (ak, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GLENNIS HARVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 of 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 of 3)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Habeas Petition by GLENNIS HARVE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Petitioner mother declaration, #2 Declaration Immigration attorney declaration)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GLENNIS HARVE. (BOAZ, MATTHEW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-9193930.), filed by GLENNIS HARVE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARVE v RODRIGUEZ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK GIANNANTONIO
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G WHITAKER
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GLENNIS HARVE
Represented By: MATTHEW SINCLAIR BOAZ
Represented By: MATTHEW ANTHONY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?