WILDER v. MHA, LLC d/b/a Meadowlands Hospital Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: JERRY WILDER
Defendant: PREAKNESS HEALTHCARE CENTER, MHA, LLC d/b/a Meadowlands Hospital Medical Center, NATHALIE RESEN, COUNTY OF PASSAIC, ANNA YARMULNIK, KELLY NUNEZ, CLAUDE MACALUSO, JANE DOE DIETICIANS 1-50, MEADOWLANDS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CNA'S AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES 1-50, RICHARD ROES 1-10, JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS 1-50, JANE DOE NURSES 1-50, JANE ROE TECHNICIANS, ABC CORPORATION AND ABC PARTNERSHIP and MHA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv16455
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 2/26/19 at 10:45am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/18/19. (tjg, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PREAKNESS HEALTHCARE CENTER, COUNTY OF PASSAIC.(DEGREGORIO, JACQUELINE)
December 21, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #7 Order submitted by PREAKNESS HEALTHCARE CENTER, COUNTY OF PASSAIC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/14/2019. (JB, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY V. SURGENT on behalf of COUNTY OF PASSAIC, PREAKNESS HEALTHCARE CENTER (SURGENT, JAY)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Granting #4 Letter from Jacqueline A. DeGregorio requesting an Order allowing to answer on or before January 14, 2019., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/20/2018. (JB, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE A. DEGREGORIO on behalf of COUNTY OF PASSAIC, PREAKNESS HEALTHCARE CENTER (DEGREGORIO, JACQUELINE)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Jacqueline A. DeGregorio requesting an Order allowing to answer on or before January 14, 2019. (DEGREGORIO, JACQUELINE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MHA, LLC identifying ATRP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ys, )
November 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MHA, LLC d/b/a Meadowlands Hospital Medical Center.(AGRESTA, ROBERT)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MHA, LLC d/b/a Meadowlands Hospital Medical Center from Superior Court of New Jersey Passaic County, case number PAS-L-3333-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9194631), filed by MHA, LLC d/b/a Meadowlands Hospital Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A PART I - COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit A PART II - TRACK ASSIGNMENT, #3 Exhibit B - STATE NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #4 Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT)(AGRESTA, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILDER v. MHA, LLC d/b/a Meadowlands Hospital Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREAKNESS HEALTHCARE CENTER
Represented By: JACQUELINE A. DEGREGORIO
Represented By: JAY V. SURGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHA, LLC d/b/a Meadowlands Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: ANTHONY K. MODAFFERI, III
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY AGRESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHALIE RESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF PASSAIC
Represented By: JACQUELINE A. DEGREGORIO
Represented By: JAY V. SURGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA YARMULNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY NUNEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDE MACALUSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE DIETICIANS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEADOWLANDS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: ANTHONY K. MODAFFERI, III
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY AGRESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA'S AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE NURSES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE TECHNICIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION AND ABC PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHA, LLC
Represented By: ANTHONY K. MODAFFERI, III
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY AGRESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY WILDER
Represented By: JENNIFER HOPE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?