ALBANY COUNTY FASTENERS et al v. EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION

Plaintiff: RAW PRODUCTS CORP. and ALBANY COUNTY FASTENERS
Defendant: EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv17214
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. etc. *** CIVIL CASE TERMINATED *** Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/31/2019. (dam, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER OPINION FILED WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT. etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/31/2019. (dam, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss to Dismiss the Complaint or, Alternatively, Stay the Action (GALANT, FELICE)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Dismiss to Dismiss the Complaint or, Alternatively, Stay the Action (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Ayesha Hamilton in Opposition, #2 Certification Certification of Robert Cominos in Opposition, #3 Certificate of Service)(HAMILTON, AYESHA)
December 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard #4 Attorney Admittance Letter re AYESHA HAMILTON, ESQ. This attorney is admitted to practice in our court, and will be added to the docket pending the ECF registration process. (dam, )
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss to Dismiss the Complaint or, Alternatively, Stay the Action. Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss to Dismiss the Complaint or, Alternatively, Stay the Action by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION. Responses due by 1/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Epicor Software Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or, Alternatively, Stay the Action, #2 Declaration of Felice B. Galant in Support of Defendant's Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(GALANT, FELICE)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (dam, )
December 17, 2018 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by FELICE BETH GALANT on behalf of EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION (GALANT, FELICE)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION identifying Epicor, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GALANT, FELICE)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-007542-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9243137), filed by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GALANT, FELICE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALBANY COUNTY FASTENERS et al v. EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAW PRODUCTS CORP.
Represented By: AYESHA KRISHNAN HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBANY COUNTY FASTENERS
Represented By: AYESHA KRISHNAN HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Represented By: FELICE BETH GALANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?