DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. RUHIEE LLC et al

Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: RUHIEE LLC, SURESH PATEL and TORAL PATEL
Case Number: 2:2018cv17574
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: Joseph A Dickson
1 Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER-ORDER ORIGINAL FILED WITH THE CLERK OF COURT; Our records indicate that proof of service has been filed in this civil action and that the time for defendants to answer has expired. You are hereby directed to move this civil action by requesting that a default and defendant judgment be entered or submitting an extension to Answer out of time within fourteen (14) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on March 5, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 02/19/2019. (sms)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. All Defendants. (COUCH, BRYAN)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TORAL PATEL, SURESH PATEL, RUHIEE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TORAL PATEL, SURESH PATEL, RUHIEE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9266342), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. RUHIEE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUHIEE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURESH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORAL PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?