ACOSTA et al v. HIGHWAY ENTERTAINMENT et al
Plaintiff: RHIAN SUGDEN, PAOLA CANAS, MEGAN DANIELS, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, BRENDA GEIGER, JACLYN SWEDBERG, SARA UNDERWOOD, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, RAQUEL GIBSON, CORA SKINNER, MASHA LUND, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, DESSIE MITCHESON, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, URSULA MAYES, NIKKI LEIGH, RACHEL KOREN, BROOKE TAYLOR, ROSIE JONES, VIDA GUERRA, LAURIE ROMEO, KARA MONACO, SHEENA LEE WEBER, LINA POSADA, ALANA SOUZA, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, CARISSA ROSARIO, SABELLA SHAKE, HILLARY HEPNER, JESSA HINTON, MARKETA KAZDOVA, DENISE MILANI, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, TIFFANY SELBY, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, IRINA VORONINA, EVA PEPAJ, CAMILLA DAVALOS, ROSA ACOSTA, JOANNA KRUPA, JULIANNE KLAREN, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, KIMBERLY COZZENS, ANA CHERI, ATHENA LUNDBERG, LUCY PINDER, JESSICA KILLINGS, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JAMIE MIDDLETON, JORDAN CARVER, JESSE GOLDEN and MARIANA DAVALOS
Defendant: DELILAH'S DEN ATLANTIC CITY, XSCAPE GOGO, PROPERTIES 40 BRIGHTON, LLC, CLUB CHAMPAGNE, SAINTS & SINNERS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, BLUSH GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, PALACE GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, P.R.B.A. CORP., DELILAH'S DEN OF HAZLET, 202 RESTAURANT, LLC, WIL-DAM CORP., HIGHWAY ENTERTAINMENT, D.M.Z., INC., 565 LANDIS, LLC, SINSATIONS, LLC, BABES NOLA, CHEEQUES, LLC, FOXTAILS LOUNGE, DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER, HI-BEAMS GO GO, BREATHLESS, INC and AJ'S GOGO
Case Number: 2:2018cv17725
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 35 Joint Discovery Plan by ROSA ACOSTA, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, PAOLA CANAS, JORDAN CARVER, ANA CHERI, KIMBERLY COZZENS, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, MEGAN DANIELS, CAMILLA DAVALOS, MARIANA DAVALOS, BRENDA GEIGER, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, RAQUEL GIBSON, JESSE GOLDEN, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, VIDA GUERRA, HILLARY HEPNER, JESSA HINTON, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, ROSIE JONES, MARKETA KAZDOVA, JESSICA KILLINGS, JULIANNE KLAREN, RACHEL KOREN, JOANNA KRUPA, NIKKI LEIGH, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, MASHA LUND, ATHENA LUNDBERG, URSULA MAYES, JAMIE MIDDLETON, DENISE MILANI, DESSIE MITCHESON, KARA MONACO, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, EVA PEPAJ, LUCY PINDER, LINA POSADA, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, LAURIE ROMEO, CARISSA ROSARIO, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, TIFFANY SELBY, SABELLA SHAKE, CORA SKINNER, ALANA SOUZA, RHIAN SUGDEN, JACLYN SWEDBERG, BROOKE TAYLOR, SARA UNDERWOOD, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, IRINA VORONINA, SHEENA LEE WEBER, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter to Judge Wettre)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)
February 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN PATRICK WERLEY on behalf of SAINTS & SINNERS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB (WERLEY, BRYAN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by MARLO J. HITTMAN on behalf of AJ'S GOGO (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Wettre)(HITTMAN, MARLO)
February 22, 2019 Filing 32 Joint Discovery Plan by ROSA ACOSTA, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, PAOLA CANAS, JORDAN CARVER, ANA CHERI, KIMBERLY COZZENS, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, MEGAN DANIELS, CAMILLA DAVALOS, MARIANA DAVALOS, BRENDA GEIGER, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, RAQUEL GIBSON, JESSE GOLDEN, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, VIDA GUERRA, HILLARY HEPNER, JESSA HINTON, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, ROSIE JONES, MARKETA KAZDOVA, JESSICA KILLINGS, JULIANNE KLAREN, RACHEL KOREN, JOANNA KRUPA, NIKKI LEIGH, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, MASHA LUND, ATHENA LUNDBERG, URSULA MAYES, JAMIE MIDDLETON, DENISE MILANI, DESSIE MITCHESON, KARA MONACO, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, EVA PEPAJ, LUCY PINDER, LINA POSADA, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, LAURIE ROMEO, CARISSA ROSARIO, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, TIFFANY SELBY, SABELLA SHAKE, CORA SKINNER, ALANA SOUZA, RHIAN SUGDEN, JACLYN SWEDBERG, BROOKE TAYLOR, SARA UNDERWOOD, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, IRINA VORONINA, SHEENA LEE WEBER, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter to Judge Wettre)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)
February 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
February 21, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #30 Order, submitted by 202 RESTAURANT, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/8/2019. (JB, )
February 21, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #31 Order, submitted by XSCAPE GOGO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/8/2019. (JB, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER Granting #25 Letter from Danielle DeGeorgio with Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead for Defendant Xscape. Defendant Xscape GOGO shall have until 3/8/2019 to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/20/2019. (JB, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT ORDER Granting #26 Letter from Danielle DeGeorgio with Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead on Behalf of Defendant 202 Restaurant, LLC d/b/a Wet Gentlemen's Club. Defendant 202 Restaurant, LLC shall have until 3/8/2019 to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/20/2019. (JB, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATHENA LUNDBERG, MASHA LUND, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, ANA CHERI, JULIANNE KLAREN, VIDA GUERRA, RAQUEL GIBSON, LAURIE ROMEO, IRINA VORONINA, RACHEL KOREN, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JESSA HINTON, MEGAN DANIELS, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, JAMIE MIDDLETON, CAMILLA DAVALOS, SABELLA SHAKE, NIKKI LEIGH, RHIAN SUGDEN, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, LUCY PINDER, MARIANA DAVALOS, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, BROOKE TAYLOR, SHEENA LEE WEBER, CARISSA ROSARIO, HILLARY HEPNER, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JESSE GOLDEN, ROSA ACOSTA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, EVA PEPAJ, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, MARKETA KAZDOVA, SARA UNDERWOOD, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, LINA POSADA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSIE JONES, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JORDAN CARVER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, DENISE MILANI, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JACLYN SWEDBERG, TIFFANY SELBY, KIMBERLY COZZENS, KARA MONACO, ALANA SOUZA, URSULA MAYES, DESSIE MITCHESON, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, PAOLA CANAS. SAINTS & SINNERS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB served on 1/26/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by BREATHLESS, INC. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification Certification of Christopher Kontos in support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed form of Order)(SCHMIDT, JOHN)
February 15, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Blush Gentlemen's Club, Club Champagne, Foxtails Lounge, WIL-DAM Corp., d/b/a Shavers, Sinsations, LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ld, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Default by ROSA ACOSTA, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, PAOLA CANAS, JORDAN CARVER, ANA CHERI, KIMBERLY COZZENS, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, MEGAN DANIELS, CAMILLA DAVALOS, MARIANA DAVALOS, BRENDA GEIGER, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, RAQUEL GIBSON, JESSE GOLDEN, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, VIDA GUERRA, HILLARY HEPNER, JESSA HINTON, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, ROSIE JONES, MARKETA KAZDOVA, JESSICA KILLINGS, JULIANNE KLAREN, RACHEL KOREN, JOANNA KRUPA, NIKKI LEIGH, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, MASHA LUND, ATHENA LUNDBERG, URSULA MAYES, JAMIE MIDDLETON, DENISE MILANI, DESSIE MITCHESON, KARA MONACO, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, EVA PEPAJ, LUCY PINDER, LINA POSADA, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, LAURIE ROMEO, CARISSA ROSARIO, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, TIFFANY SELBY, SABELLA SHAKE, CORA SKINNER, ALANA SOUZA, RHIAN SUGDEN, JACLYN SWEDBERG, BROOKE TAYLOR, SARA UNDERWOOD, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, IRINA VORONINA, SHEENA LEE WEBER, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA against Blush Gentlemen's Club, Club Champagne, Foxtails Lounge, WIL-DAM Corp. d/b/a Shakers and Sinsations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Certificate for Entry of Default, #2 Declaration Declaration of William J. Pinilis in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Danielle DeGeorgio with Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead on Behalf of Defendant 202 Restaurant, LLC d/b/a Wet Gentlemen's Club. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Answer or Otherwise Plead for Defendant 202 Restaurant, LLC d/b/a Wet Gentlemen's Club)(DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
February 14, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from Danielle DeGeorgio with Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead for Defendant Xscape. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Consent Order to Answer or otherwise plead for defendant Xscape)(DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
February 13, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEEQUES, LLC. (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
February 13, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims by CHEEQUES, LLC.(DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT ORDER granting Defendant Breathless Inc.'s #20 Letter request extending time to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint to 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/13/2019. (gl, )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT ORDER granting Defendants P.R.B.A. Corp's #19 Letter request extending time to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint to 3/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/13/2019. (gl, )
February 13, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The extension request submitted by D.M.Z., INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/1/2019. (gl, )
February 13, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The extension request submitted by P.R.B.A. CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/15/2019. (gl, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from John H. Schmidt, Jr., Esq.. (SCHMIDT, JOHN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Adam Gersh enclosing proposed Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Plead)(GERSH, ADAM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELILAH'S DEN ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF HAZLET, DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER. (LONSKI, DAVID)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATHENA LUNDBERG, MASHA LUND, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, ANA CHERI, JULIANNE KLAREN, VIDA GUERRA, RAQUEL GIBSON, LAURIE ROMEO, IRINA VORONINA, RACHEL KOREN, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JESSA HINTON, MEGAN DANIELS, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, JAMIE MIDDLETON, CAMILLA DAVALOS, SABELLA SHAKE, NIKKI LEIGH, RHIAN SUGDEN, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, LUCY PINDER, MARIANA DAVALOS, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, BROOKE TAYLOR, SHEENA LEE WEBER, CARISSA ROSARIO, HILLARY HEPNER, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JESSE GOLDEN, ROSA ACOSTA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, EVA PEPAJ, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, MARKETA KAZDOVA, SARA UNDERWOOD, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, LINA POSADA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSIE JONES, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JORDAN CARVER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, DENISE MILANI, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JACLYN SWEDBERG, TIFFANY SELBY, KIMBERLY COZZENS, KARA MONACO, ALANA SOUZA, URSULA MAYES, DESSIE MITCHESON, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, PAOLA CANAS. HIGHWAY ENTERTAINMENT served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC GREGORY SIEGEL on behalf of HI-BEAMS GO GO (SIEGEL, ERIC)
February 8, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The #13 request Letter submitted by HI-BEAMS GO GO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/7/2019. (gl, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendant's #13 Letter request for a 30 day extension in time to answer, move or otherwise plead in response to Complaint to 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/6/2019. (gl, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 LONSKI, DAVID P. ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DELILAH'S DEN ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF HAZLET, DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER.(LONSKI, DAVID)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SIEGEL, ERIC)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/27/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/31/2019. (kd)
January 31, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by CHEEQUES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/13/2019. (sm)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BABES NOLA.(BERNSTEIN, ERIC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATHENA LUNDBERG, MASHA LUND, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, ANA CHERI, JULIANNE KLAREN, VIDA GUERRA, RAQUEL GIBSON, LAURIE ROMEO, IRINA VORONINA, RACHEL KOREN, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JESSA HINTON, MEGAN DANIELS, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, JAMIE MIDDLETON, CAMILLA DAVALOS, SABELLA SHAKE, NIKKI LEIGH, RHIAN SUGDEN, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, LUCY PINDER, MARIANA DAVALOS, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, BROOKE TAYLOR, SHEENA LEE WEBER, CARISSA ROSARIO, HILLARY HEPNER, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JESSE GOLDEN, ROSA ACOSTA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, EVA PEPAJ, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, MARKETA KAZDOVA, SARA UNDERWOOD, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, LINA POSADA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSIE JONES, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JORDAN CARVER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, DENISE MILANI, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JACLYN SWEDBERG, TIFFANY SELBY, KIMBERLY COZZENS, KARA MONACO, ALANA SOUZA, URSULA MAYES, DESSIE MITCHESON, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, PAOLA CANAS. PROPERTIES 40 BRIGHTON, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019; SINSATIONS, LLC served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Cheeques, LLC.. (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE MARIA DEGEORGIO on behalf of CHEEQUES, LLC (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
January 29, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by P.R.B.A. CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/13/2019. (ys, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs Complaint. Attorney ADAM EDWARD GERSH for P.R.B.A. CORP. added. (GERSH, ADAM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATHENA LUNDBERG, MASHA LUND, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, ANA CHERI, JULIANNE KLAREN, VIDA GUERRA, RAQUEL GIBSON, LAURIE ROMEO, IRINA VORONINA, RACHEL KOREN, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JESSA HINTON, MEGAN DANIELS, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, JAMIE MIDDLETON, CAMILLA DAVALOS, SABELLA SHAKE, NIKKI LEIGH, RHIAN SUGDEN, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, LUCY PINDER, MARIANA DAVALOS, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, BROOKE TAYLOR, SHEENA LEE WEBER, CARISSA ROSARIO, HILLARY HEPNER, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JESSE GOLDEN, ROSA ACOSTA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, EVA PEPAJ, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, MARKETA KAZDOVA, SARA UNDERWOOD, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, LINA POSADA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSIE JONES, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JORDAN CARVER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, DENISE MILANI, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JACLYN SWEDBERG, TIFFANY SELBY, KIMBERLY COZZENS, KARA MONACO, ALANA SOUZA, URSULA MAYES, DESSIE MITCHESON, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, PAOLA CANAS. D.M.Z., INC. served on 1/14/2018, answer due 2/4/2018; DELILAH'S DEN ATLANTIC CITY served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
January 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATHENA LUNDBERG, MASHA LUND, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, ANA CHERI, JULIANNE KLAREN, VIDA GUERRA, RAQUEL GIBSON, LAURIE ROMEO, IRINA VORONINA, RACHEL KOREN, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JESSA HINTON, MEGAN DANIELS, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, JAMIE MIDDLETON, CAMILLA DAVALOS, SABELLA SHAKE, NIKKI LEIGH, RHIAN SUGDEN, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, LUCY PINDER, MARIANA DAVALOS, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, BROOKE TAYLOR, SHEENA LEE WEBER, CARISSA ROSARIO, HILLARY HEPNER, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JESSE GOLDEN, ROSA ACOSTA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, EVA PEPAJ, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, MARKETA KAZDOVA, SARA UNDERWOOD, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, LINA POSADA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSIE JONES, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JORDAN CARVER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, DENISE MILANI, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JACLYN SWEDBERG, TIFFANY SELBY, KIMBERLY COZZENS, KARA MONACO, ALANA SOUZA, URSULA MAYES, DESSIE MITCHESON, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, PAOLA CANAS. DELILAH'S DEN OF HAZLET served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019; DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; FOXTAILS LOUNGE served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATHENA LUNDBERG, MASHA LUND, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, ANA CHERI, JULIANNE KLAREN, VIDA GUERRA, RAQUEL GIBSON, LAURIE ROMEO, IRINA VORONINA, RACHEL KOREN, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JESSA HINTON, MEGAN DANIELS, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, JAMIE MIDDLETON, CAMILLA DAVALOS, SABELLA SHAKE, NIKKI LEIGH, RHIAN SUGDEN, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, LUCY PINDER, MARIANA DAVALOS, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, BROOKE TAYLOR, SHEENA LEE WEBER, CARISSA ROSARIO, HILLARY HEPNER, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JESSE GOLDEN, ROSA ACOSTA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, EVA PEPAJ, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, MARKETA KAZDOVA, SARA UNDERWOOD, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, LINA POSADA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSIE JONES, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JORDAN CARVER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, DENISE MILANI, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JACLYN SWEDBERG, TIFFANY SELBY, KIMBERLY COZZENS, KARA MONACO, ALANA SOUZA, URSULA MAYES, DESSIE MITCHESON, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, PAOLA CANAS. 202 RESTAURANT, LLC served on 1/5/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; 565 LANDIS, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; BABES NOLA served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019; BLUSH GENTLEMEN'S CLUB served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; CHEEQUES, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; CLUB CHAMPAGNE served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; HI-BEAMS GO GO served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; P.R.B.A. CORP. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019; WIL-DAM CORP. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; XSCAPE GOGO served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ti)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT) (ti)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 202 RESTAURANT, LLC d/b/a WET GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, 565 LANDIS, LLC d/b/a CRAZY HORSE CENTERFOLDS CABARET AND JUST ENUFF CABARET, BABES NOLA, BLUSH GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, CHEEQUES, LLC d/b/a CHEEQUES GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, CLUB CHAMPAGNE, D.M.Z., INC. d/b/a BREATHLESS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, DELILAH'S DEN ATLANTIC CITY, DELILAH'S DEN OF HAZLET, DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER, FOXTAILS LOUNGE, HI-BEAMS GO GO, HIGHWAY ENTERTAINMENT d/b/a AJ'S GOGO, P.R.B.A. CORP. d/b/a BARE EXPOSURE, PALACE GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, PROPERTIES 40 BRIGHTON, LLC d/b/a PLATINUM DOLLZ GENTLEMEN'S CLUB AND RESTAURANT, SAINTS & SINNERS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, SINSATIONS, LLC d/b/a SINSATIONS GO GO, WIL-DAM CORP. d/b/a SHAKERS, XSCAPE GOGO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9271619) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ATHENA LUNDBERG, MASHA LUND, KRYSTAL HIPWELL, ANA CHERI, JULIANNE KLAREN, VIDA GUERRA, RAQUEL GIBSON, LAURIE ROMEO, IRINA VORONINA, RACHEL KOREN, HEATHER RAE YOUNG, JESSA HINTON, MEGAN DANIELS, JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA, JAMIE MIDDLETON, CAMILLA DAVALOS, SABELLA SHAKE, NIKKI LEIGH, RHIAN SUGDEN, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, LUCY PINDER, MARIANA DAVALOS, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, BROOKE TAYLOR, SHEENA LEE WEBER, CARISSA ROSARIO, HILLARY HEPNER, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, JENNIFER ARCHULETA, JESSE GOLDEN, ROSA ACOSTA, ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, EVA PEPAJ, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, MARKETA KAZDOVA, SARA UNDERWOOD, LAURIE FETTER JACOBS, LINA POSADA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSIE JONES, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JORDAN CARVER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, DENISE MILANI, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, JACLYN SWEDBERG, TIFFANY SELBY, KIMBERLY COZZENS, KARA MONACO, ALANA SOUZA, URSULA MAYES, DESSIE MITCHESON, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, PAOLA CANAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)
December 28, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACOSTA et al v. HIGHWAY ENTERTAINMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELILAH'S DEN ATLANTIC CITY
Represented By: DAVID P. LONSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XSCAPE GOGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROPERTIES 40 BRIGHTON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLUB CHAMPAGNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINTS & SINNERS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB
Represented By: BRYAN PATRICK WERLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUSH GENTLEMEN'S CLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALACE GENTLEMEN'S CLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.R.B.A. CORP.
Represented By: ADAM EDWARD GERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELILAH'S DEN OF HAZLET
Represented By: DAVID P. LONSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 202 RESTAURANT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIL-DAM CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHWAY ENTERTAINMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.M.Z., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 565 LANDIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINSATIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABES NOLA
Represented By: ERIC MARTIN BERNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEEQUES, LLC
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIA DEGEORGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOXTAILS LOUNGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER
Represented By: DAVID P. LONSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-BEAMS GO GO
Represented By: ERIC GREGORY SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREATHLESS, INC
Represented By: JOHN H. SCHMIDT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ'S GOGO
Represented By: MARLO J. HITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHIAN SUGDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAOLA CANAS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN DANIELS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER ARCHULETA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIANNY CELESTE LOPEZ
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GEIGER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACLYN SWEDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA UNDERWOOD
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRYSTAL HIPWELL
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAQUEL GIBSON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORA SKINNER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASHA LUND
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER BURCIAGA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE EDMONDSON LONGORIA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESSIE MITCHESON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY TOTH GRAY
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURIE FETTER JACOBS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: URSULA MAYES
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKKI LEIGH
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL KOREN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKE TAYLOR
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSIE JONES
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIDA GUERRA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURIE ROMEO
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA MONACO
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEENA LEE WEBER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINA POSADA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA SOUZA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABIGAIL RATCHFORD
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA LEIGH PATRICK
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARISSA ROSARIO
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABELLA SHAKE
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILLARY HEPNER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSA HINTON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARKETA KAZDOVA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE MILANI
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER RAE YOUNG
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER ZHARINOVA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY SELBY
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRINA VORONINA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA PEPAJ
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMILLA DAVALOS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA ACOSTA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNA KRUPA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIANNE KLAREN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIELO JEAN GIBSON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATARINA VAN DERHAM
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY COZZENS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA CHERI
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHENA LUNDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY PINDER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA KILLINGS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IESHA MARIE CRESPO
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE MIDDLETON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN CARVER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE GOLDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANA DAVALOS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?