JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., v. CMA TRADING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Defendant: Gunther Eben, CMA Trading, Inc. and Hong Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00130
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $34,407.32 (ck)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/14/2019. (kd)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 Verified Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Interpleader Complaint with JURY DEMAND; filed by GUNTHER EBEN. (Attachments: #1 Confidential Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(sms)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against CMA TRADING, INC., GUNTHER EBEN by HONG HOLDINGS, LLC.(BENISATTO, ALEXANDER)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HONG HOLDINGS, LLC. (BENISATTO, ALEXANDER)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER, Granting #4 Motion of Interpleader, Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Deposit Funds into the Court Registry; It is further Ordered that the sum of $34,404.03 be deposited by the Clerk of the Court into the registry of this court and then, as soon as the business of his or her office allows, the Clerk of Court shall deposit these funds into the interest-bearing DOF established within the CRIS and administered by the Administrative Office of the United Courts as Custodian which shall be responsible for meeting all DOF tax administration requirements, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/8/2019. (JB, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Certificate of Cash Deposit in the amount of $ 34,407.32, Receipt Number NEW038669 filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Finance Notified). (sms)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Anthony C. Valenziano re #5 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds,. (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY)
February 1, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HONG HOLDINGS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 02/19/2019. (sms)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to complaint filed by plaintiff. Attorney ALEXANDER G. BENISATTO,STUART REISER for HONG HOLDINGS, LLC added. (BENISATTO, ALEXANDER)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hong Holdings, LLC on January 14, 2019, filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on CMA Trading, Inc. on January 16, 2019, filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Gunther Eben on January 16, 2019, filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, granting #4 Motion of Interpleader, Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Deposit Funds into the Court Registry; Chase shall deposit the sum of $34,404.03 with the registry within fifteen (15) days of the entry of this Order; etc. (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 01/23/2019. (sms)
January 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court Registry. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court Registry by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(VALENZIANO, ANTHONY)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CMA TRADING, INC., GUNTHER EBEN, HONG HOLDINGS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
January 7, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CMA Trading, Inc., Gunther Eben, Hong Holdings, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9283486), filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VALENZIANO, ANTHONY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., v. CMA TRADING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunther Eben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMA Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Holdings, LLC
Represented By: STUART REISER
Represented By: ALEXANDER G. BENISATTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: ANTHONY C. VALENZIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?