TRIAD ENGINEERS & CONSTRUCTORS, INC. v. HYNES INDUSTRIES

Plaintiff: TRIAD ENGINEERS & CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Defendant: HYNES INDUSTRIES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00259
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: Claire C Cecchi
1 Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Letter. ORDER Resetting Hearing on #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion reset for 4/1/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/4/2019. (dam, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
February 21, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by HYNES INDUSTRIES. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A)(SHERMAN, ANDREW)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 3/25/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/1/2019. (spc, )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Letter from All Parties. The time within which Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended twenty-one (21) days to and including2/19/2019 and Rule 16 is set for 3/25/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/25/2019. (JB, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHERMAN, ANDREW)
January 11, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/29/2019. (JB, ) Modified on 1/11/2019 (JB, ). Modified on 1/11/2019 (JB, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA MORRISON KESSLER on behalf of HYNES INDUSTRIES (KESSLER, LAURA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SHERMAN, ANDREW)
January 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HYNES INDUSTRIES. (SHERMAN, ANDREW)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HYNES INDUSTRIES from New Jersey Superior Court, Morris County, Law Division, case number MRS-L-002390-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9292053), filed by HYNES INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(SHERMAN, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRIAD ENGINEERS & CONSTRUCTORS, INC. v. HYNES INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYNES INDUSTRIES
Represented By: ANDREW H. SHERMAN
Represented By: LAURA MORRISON KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRIAD ENGINEERS & CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?