WILLIAM H. CONNOLLY & CO., LLC v. INTEGRO USA, INC. et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM H. CONNOLLY & CO., LLC
Defendant: KIM S. RITER and INTEGRO USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00294
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Discovery Plan by INTEGRO USA, INC., KIM S. RITER.(LEVA, JAMES)
February 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to DANIEL L. SCHWARTZ, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW038848 (dam, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Letter/Application as to the Pro Hac Vice admission of DANIEL L. SCHWARTZ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/7/2019. (dam, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 Certification of Counsel Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 201.1(d) on behalf of INTEGRO USA, INC., KIM S. RITER Re Case Assigned/Reassigned. (LEVA, JAMES)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from James M. Leva Regarding Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel L. Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James M. Leva, #2 Certification of Daniel L. Schwartz, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(LEVA, JAMES)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/17/2019. (spc, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(LEVA, JAMES)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES MICHAEL LEVA on behalf of All Defendants (LEVA, JAMES)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. WARD on behalf of WILLIAM H. CONNOLLY & CO., LLC (WARD, DAVID)
January 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTEGRO USA, INC.. (DELL, MICHAEL)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL HENRY DELL on behalf of All Defendants (DELL, MICHAEL)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KIM S. RITER, INTEGRO USA, INC. from Essex County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-8666-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9293826), filed by KIM S. RITER, INTEGRO USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DELL, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAM H. CONNOLLY & CO., LLC v. INTEGRO USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM S. RITER
Represented By: MICHAEL HENRY DELL
Represented By: JAMES MICHAEL LEVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEGRO USA, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL HENRY DELL
Represented By: JAMES MICHAEL LEVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM H. CONNOLLY & CO., LLC
Represented By: DAVID A. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?