ADDERLEY v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC.

Plaintiff: NA'JADAH ADDERLEY
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00425
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Michael T. Bissinger Advising of Settlement. (BISSINGER, MICHAEL)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 United Parcel Service, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint of Na'jadah Adderley by All Defendants.(BISSINGER, MICHAEL)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Refund of Fees from Notice of Removal Duplicate Filing Fee (finance notified).. (BISSINGER, MICHAEL)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by NA'JADAH ADDERLEY. (KRUMHOLZ, ALAN)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ARIANNA MOURE on behalf of All Defendants (MOURE, ARIANNA)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 3/28/2019 10:45 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/28/2019. (spc, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent ORDER extending time to Answer complaint until 2/5/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/28/2019. (spc, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION and Consent Order for Extension of Time to Answer by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Enclosing Stipulation and Consent Order)(BISSINGER, MICHAEL)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC. identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BISSINGER, MICHAEL)
January 14, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by UNITED STATES PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC. on 01/11/2019 was submitted with a CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (TI)
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Hudson County, case number L-003187-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9301100), filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Statement Corporate Disclosure, #7 Certification of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(BISSINGER, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADDERLEY v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (UPS), INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL T. BISSINGER
Represented By: ARIANNA MOURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NA'JADAH ADDERLEY
Represented By: ALAN L. KRUMHOLZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?