SAHAI et al v. CARABELLESE et al

Plaintiff: BRIGHT FUTURE DAYCARE A NJ NON-PROFIT CORPORATION and ROONEY SAHAI
Defendant: HUDSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, PHILIP LAMPARELLO, FIRST COMMERCE BANK, PATRICK CARABELLESE, MARIO VALENTE, JR., CHASAN LAMPARELLO MALLON & CAPPUZZO, P.C., MARIO VALENTE and BALLENTE REALTY ASSOCIATES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00433
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose L Linares
Referring Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this action is Dismissed Without Prejudice; all pending motions and deadlines in this action, including but not limited to Defendant First Commerce Bank's Motion to Dismiss #6 are Administratively Terminated Without Prejudice; and this matter is Closed. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/27/2019. (sm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BRIGHT FUTURE DAYCARE A NJ NON-PROFIT CORPORATION, ROONEY SAHAI (BERMUDEZ, ADRIAN)
February 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by FIRST COMMERCE BANK. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KAVENDEK, JACLYN)
February 7, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by MARIO VALENTE, MARIO VALENTE, JR., PATRICK CARABELLESE, CHASAN LAMPARELLO MALLON & CAPPUZZO, P.C., BALLENTE REALTY ASSOCIATES, PHILIP LAMPARELLO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/4/2019. (sm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Ballente Realty Associates, Patrick Carabellese, Mario Valente, Mario Valente, Jr., Chasan Lamparello Mallon & Capuzzo, P.C. and Philip Lamparello, Esq... (POTTERS, GARY)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY POTTERS on behalf of BALLENTE REALTY ASSOCIATES, PATRICK CARABELLESE, CHASAN LAMPARELLO MALLON & CAPPUZZO, P.C., PHILIP LAMPARELLO, MARIO VALENTE, MARIO VALENTE, JR. (POTTERS, GARY)
January 31, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by FIRST COMMERCE BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/19/2019. (sm)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JACLYN M. KAVENDEK for FIRST COMMERCE BANK added. (KAVENDEK, JACLYN)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (TI)
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9301165) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRIGHT FUTURE DAYCARE A NJ NON-PROFIT CORPORATION, ROONEY SAHAI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERMUDEZ, ADRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAHAI et al v. CARABELLESE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP LAMPARELLO
Represented By: GARY POTTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST COMMERCE BANK
Represented By: JACLYN M. KAVENDEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK CARABELLESE
Represented By: GARY POTTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIO VALENTE, JR.
Represented By: GARY POTTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASAN LAMPARELLO MALLON & CAPPUZZO, P.C.
Represented By: GARY POTTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIO VALENTE
Represented By: GARY POTTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALLENTE REALTY ASSOCIATES
Represented By: GARY POTTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGHT FUTURE DAYCARE A NJ NON-PROFIT CORPORATION
Represented By: ADRIAN ERNESTO BERMUDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROONEY SAHAI
Represented By: ADRIAN ERNESTO BERMUDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?