LAGANA v. AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP INC. et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY LAGANA
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP INC., INC. AMERICAN AIRLINES, JOHN DOE AMERICAN AIRLINES FLIGHT ATTENDANTS 1-5 and AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00435
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 4/12/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/15/2019. (spc, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY LYN RAYMOND on behalf of AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. (RAYMOND, KELLY)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX STEVEN CAPOZZI on behalf of GREGORY LAGANA (CAPOZZI, ALEX)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (TI)
January 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9301707) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GREGORY LAGANA.(CAPOZZI, EDWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAGANA v. AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP INC.
Represented By: KELLY LYN RAYMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INC. AMERICAN AIRLINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE AMERICAN AIRLINES FLIGHT ATTENDANTS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: KELLY LYN RAYMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY LAGANA
Represented By: EDWARD P. CAPOZZI
Represented By: ALEX STEVEN CAPOZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?