PIER 541 LLC v. THE CRAB HOUSE, INC. et al

Plaintiff: PIER 541 LLC
Defendant: THE CRAB HOUSE, INC., BAYPORT RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., LANDRY'S SEAFOOD RESTAURANTS, INC., JOHN/JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 10 and ABC CORPORATIONS AND OTHER LEGAL ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00437
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/14/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2019. Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/20/2019.;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/8/2019. (ld, )
March 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/8/2019. (tjg, )
January 29, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 3/8/19 at 10:15am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/29/19. (tjg, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CRAB HOUSE, INC. identifying LSRI Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GODFREY, GEORGE)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by THE CRAB HOUSE, INC..(GODFREY, GEORGE)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE C. GODFREY, III on behalf of THE CRAB HOUSE, INC. (GODFREY, GEORGE)
January 14, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ld, )
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Landry's Seafood Restaurants, Inc., The Crab House, Inc. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-8445-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9301844), filed by Landry's Seafood Restaurants, Inc., The Crab House, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GODFREY, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIER 541 LLC v. THE CRAB HOUSE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CRAB HOUSE, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE C. GODFREY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYPORT RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDRY'S SEAFOOD RESTAURANTS, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE C. GODFREY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS AND OTHER LEGAL ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIER 541 LLC
Represented By: JOHN A. SCHEPISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?