HINDS et al v. MURRAY et al
Plaintiff: TODD HINDS and ROSLYE HINDS
Defendant: CAROLYN MURRAY, GWENDOLYN WILLIAMS, ESSEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, COUNTY OF ESSEX, JOHN DOES 1-10, COURTNEY GACCIONE, HEAD DOE and CHERYL CUCCINELLO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00556
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Application/Petition. Defendants shall answer the Complaint or otherwise move on or before 3/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/19/2019. (dam, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION/PETITION for by All Defendants. (SANTARSIERO, DANIEL)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TODD HINDS. (HAWKINS, ELDRIDGE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TODD HINDS acceptance of summons (HAWKINS, ELDRIDGE)
February 1, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The SUMMONS Returned Executed D.E. 3 & CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE D.E. 4 submitted by ELDRIDGE HAWKINS, on 1/29/2019 & 1/31/2019 appear to contain duplicate documents, with D.E. 3 being filed using the correct event. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (byl)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (HAWKINS, ELDRIDGE)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TODD HINDS. All Defendants. (HAWKINS, ELDRIDGE)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COUNTY OF ESSEX, CHERYL CUCCINELLO, ESSEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, COURTNEY GACCIONE, CAROLYN MURRAY, GWENDOLYN WILLIAMS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ti)
January 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9311005) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HAWKINS, ELDRIDGE) Modified on 1/16/2019 (ti).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HINDS et al v. MURRAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD HINDS
Represented By: ELDRIDGE HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSLYE HINDS
Represented By: ELDRIDGE HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GWENDOLYN WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ESSEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURTNEY GACCIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEAD DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL CUCCINELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?