SIMON et al v. GIANATIEMPO, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: LEO SIMON, JOHN SIMON and LAURA SIMON
Defendant: ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CARMINE A GIANATIEMPO, M.D. and KILLOL PATEL, M.D.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00602
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Status Conference via telephone held on 3/7/2019. (LM, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on March 7, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiff is directed to arrange for the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/5/19. (LM, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Separate Defenses, Cross-claims for Contribution and Indemnification, Demand for Affidavit of Merit and Demand for Discovery by CARMINE A GIANATIEMPO, M.D., KILLOL PATEL, MD.(ALTSCHUL, JASON)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Jordan Merson Requesting Case Referral Back to Litigation re #4 Amended Complaint. (MERSON, JORDAN)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CARMINE A GIANATIEMPO, M.D., KILLOL PATEL, MD, filed by LEO SIMON, JOHN SIMON, LAURA SIMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MERSON, JORDAN)
January 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CARMINE A GIANATIEMPO, M.D., KILLOL PATEL, MD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Fein, M.D. re #1 Complaint, pursuant to N.J.S.A. 2A:53A-27 by JOHN SIMON, LAURA SIMON, LEO SIMON. (MERSON, JORDAN)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CARMINE A. GIANATIEMPO, M.D., KILLOL PATEL, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9313792) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LEO SIMON, JOHN SIMON, LAURA SIMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(MERSON, JORDAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMON et al v. GIANATIEMPO, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEO SIMON
Represented By: JORDAN KOEL MERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SIMON
Represented By: JORDAN KOEL MERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA SIMON
Represented By: JORDAN KOEL MERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMINE A GIANATIEMPO, M.D.
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL ALTSCHUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILLOL PATEL, M.D.
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL ALTSCHUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?