HOFFMAN v. NISSAN-INFINITI LT

Plaintiff: HAROLD M. HOFFMAN
Defendant: NISSAN-INFINITI LT
Case Number: 2:2019cv01046
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by HAROLD M. HOFFMAN. (BESHADA, DONALD)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by HAROLD M. HOFFMAN re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint and in support of Cross-Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald A. Beshada, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BESHADA, DONALD)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT P. DONOVAN on behalf of NISSAN-INFINITI LT (DONOVAN, ROBERT)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold the 3/29/19 rule 16 conference by telephone with the plaintiff to initiate. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/12/19. (tjg, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Letter Rule 7.1. Reset Hearing on #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion reset for 4/1/2019 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. etc. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 2/28/2019. (dam, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint . (BESHADA, DONALD)
February 27, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 3/29/19 at 10am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/27/19. (tjg, )
February 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint by NISSAN-INFINITI LT. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Soros in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(GIAMPICCOLO, SALVATORE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD ANTHONY BESHADA on behalf of HAROLD M. HOFFMAN (BESHADA, DONALD)
January 29, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NISSAN-INFINITI LT has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/14/2019. (byl)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Nissan-Infiniti LT.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(GIAMPICCOLO, SALVATORE)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NISSAN-INFINITI LT. (GIAMPICCOLO, SALVATORE)
January 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam, )
January 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption modified to reflect information in Caption of State Court Complaint. Cause of Action modified to 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Fraud. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NISSAN-INFINITI LT. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (GIAMPICCOLO, SALVATORE)
January 25, 2019 Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NISSAN-INFINITI LT from Superior Court Special Civil Part Bergen County, case number BER DC 016795 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9332979), filed by NISSAN-INFINITI LT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GIAMPICCOLO, SALVATORE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOFFMAN v. NISSAN-INFINITI LT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD M. HOFFMAN
Represented By: DONALD ANTHONY BESHADA
Represented By: HAROLD M HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISSAN-INFINITI LT
Represented By: SALVATORE A. GIAMPICCOLO
Represented By: ROBERT P. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?