RYAN et al v. LABRIOLA, D.C. et al

Plaintiff: JACQUELYN RYAN and MATT MORO
Defendant: THE CHIRO HEALTH SPA OF RAMSEY, FRANCYNE LABRIOLA, D.C., JOSEPH LABRIOLA, D.C. and FRANCYNE PILAR LABRIOLA, D.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01047
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 Exhibit to #8 Answer to Complaint Rule 7.1 Statement by THE CHIRO HEALTH SPA OF RAMSEY. (BARRESI, NICOLE)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by THE CHIRO HEALTH SPA OF RAMSEY.(BARRESI, NICOLE)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JOSEPH LABRIOLA, D.C..(BARRESI, NICOLE)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANCYNE PILAR LABRIOLA, DC.(BARRESI, NICOLE)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER; that the time in which to serve an Answer on behalf of defendants JOSEPH LABRIOLA, D.C., FRANCYNE PILAR LABRIOLA, D.C., and THE CHIRO HEALTH SPA OF RAMSEY is hereby extended to March 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/4/2019. (ld, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by All Defendants. (HSIEH, LYNN)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRANCYNE PILAR LABRIOLA, DC, JOSEPH LABRIOLA, D.C., THE CHIRO HEALTH SPA OF RAMSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
January 24, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew M. Rodgers, D.C. re #1 Complaint, pursuant to N.J.S.A. 2A:53A-27 by MATT MORO, JACQUELYN RYAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Andrew Rodgers, D.C. CV/Resume)(MERSON, JORDAN)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRANCYNE PILAR LABRIOLA, D.C., JOSEPH LABRIOLA, D.C., THE CHIRO HEALTH SPA OF RAMSEY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9332893) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JACQUELYN RYAN, MATT MORO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MERSON, JORDAN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RYAN et al v. LABRIOLA, D.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHIRO HEALTH SPA OF RAMSEY
Represented By: NICOLE STUVER BARRESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCYNE LABRIOLA, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH LABRIOLA, D.C.
Represented By: NICOLE STUVER BARRESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCYNE PILAR LABRIOLA, D.C.
Represented By: NICOLE STUVER BARRESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELYN RYAN
Represented By: JORDAN KOEL MERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT MORO
Represented By: JORDAN KOEL MERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?