HARRELL et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: DOROTHY M. JOHNSON, AJAY KAJLA, NORMA HARRELL, HILLARY MONTAGUE, SHARON MERRIWEATHER and JOSE RODRIGUES
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01417
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Diane Bettino, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Text of Proposed Order, #20 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
February 25, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/14/2019. (ld, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (BETTINO, DIANE)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (BETTINO, DIANE)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON M. BENDER on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (BENDER, AARON)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (BETTINO, DIANE)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE RODRIGUES, HILLARY MONTAGUE, NORMA HARRELL, SHARON MERRIWEATHER, DOROTHY M. JOHNSON, AJAY KAJLA. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (ld, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW038543) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOSE RODRIGUES, HILLARY MONTAGUE, NORMA HARRELL, SHARON MERRIWEATHER, DOROTHY M. JOHNSON, AJAY KAJLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibits 2 & 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Certifications, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRELL et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY M. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJAY KAJLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA HARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILLARY MONTAGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON MERRIWEATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE RODRIGUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Represented By: AARON M. BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?