LAIBOW et al v. MENASHE et al
Plaintiff: RIMA E. LAIBOW, M.D.
Defendant: RICHARD MENASHE, D.O., ABC COMPANIES (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-10), THE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GROUP, LISA CASALE, M.D., JANE MOE TECHNICIANS, CNAs, WILLIAM OSER, M.D., PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-20), JFK MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS (1-10), KINDRED HOSPITAL and DEF. PARTNERSHIPS (1-10)
Case Number: 2:2019cv04549
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 Richard Menashe, D.O. ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC COMPANIES (1-10), LISA CASALE, MD, DEF. PARTNERSHIPS (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-10), JANE MOE TECHNICIANS, CNAs, JFK MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS (1-10), KINDRED HOSPITAL, WILLIAM OSER, MD, PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-20), THE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GROUP by RICHARD MENASHE, DO.(VASIOS, JAMES)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JFK MEDICAL CENTER, KINDRED HOSPITAL, RICHARD MENASHE, DO, WILLIAM OSER, MD by LISA CASALE, MD.(O'NEILL, LAUREN)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN K. O'NEILL on behalf of LISA CASALE, MD (O'NEILL, LAUREN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LISA CASALE, MD, JFK MEDICAL CENTER, KINDRED HOSPITAL, RICHARD MENASHE, DO, WILLIAM OSER, MD, THE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GROUP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC COMPANIES (1-10), LISA CASALE, MD, DEF. PARTNERSHIPS (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-10), JANE MOE TECHNICIANS, CNAs, JFK MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS (1-10), KINDRED HOSPITAL, RICHARD MENASHE, DO, WILLIAM OSER, MD, PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-20), THE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GROUP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW038619) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RIMA E. LAIBOW, MD(spouse of ALBERT N. STUBBLEBINE, III, deceased), RIMA E. LAIBOW, MD(Administratrix Ad Prosequandum OF THE ESTATE OF MAJ. GEN. ALBERT N. STUBBLEBINE III, ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAIBOW et al v. MENASHE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD MENASHE, D.O.
Represented By: JAMES ALBERT VASIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE NURSES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA CASALE, M.D.
Represented By: LAUREN K. O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE MOE TECHNICIANS, CNAs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM OSER, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-20)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFK MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINDRED HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF. PARTNERSHIPS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIMA E. LAIBOW, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?