BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. v. SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL and SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04842
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sunstar Hospitality, LLC on 3/21/19, filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL served on 2/23/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (MEGARIOTIS, JOSEPH)
February 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL, SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
February 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL, SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9388364), filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. v. SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHANUCHANDRA G. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNSTAR HOSPITALITY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?