SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. COBURN et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: GORDON J. COBURN and STEVEN E SCHWARTZ
Case Number: 2:2019cv05820
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (WELLS, THEODORE)
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Gordon Coburn.. (KEALE, JAMES)
April 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Justin D. Lerer, Esq., receipt number TRE101329 (mps)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Justin D. Lerer, Esq.; counsel shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/2/2019. (sms )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Roberto Finzi, Esq.; counsel shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/2/2019. (sms)
March 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Sarah D. Efronson, Henry Klehm III, James P. Loonam, and Harold B. Walther, $ 600, receipt number NEW039125. (sms)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Harold B. Walther, Esq.; counsel shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/18/2019. (sms)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to the Admission of James P. Loonam, Esq.; counsel shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/18/2019. (sms)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to the Admission of Henry Klehm III, Esq.; counsel shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/18/2019. (sms)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah D. Efronson, Esq.; counsel shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/18/2019. (sms)
February 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Justin D. Lerer, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Roberto Finzi. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Justin D. Lerer by STEVEN E SCHWARTZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore V. Wells, Jr., #2 Declaration of Justin D. Lerer, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, THEODORE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Roberto Finzi by STEVEN E SCHWARTZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore V. Wells, Jr., #2 Declaration of Roberto Finzi, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, THEODORE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. STEVEN E SCHWARTZ waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (BOWERS, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. GORDON J. COBURN waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (BOWERS, JOHN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE V. WELLS, JR on behalf of STEVEN E SCHWARTZ (WELLS, THEODORE)
February 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Harold B. Walther, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of James P. Loonam, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sarah D. Efronson, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Henry Klehm III. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Harold B. Walther by GORDON J. COBURN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KEALE, JAMES)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of James P. Loonam by GORDON J. COBURN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KEALE, JAMES)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Henry Klehm III by GORDON J. COBURN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KEALE, JAMES)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sarah D. Efronson by GORDON J. COBURN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KEALE, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GORDON J. COBURN, STEVEN E SCHWARTZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
February 19, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GORDON J. COBURN, STEVEN E SCHWARTZ with JURY DEMAND, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BOWERS, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. COBURN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORDON J. COBURN
Represented By: JAMES HOLSEY KEALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN E SCHWARTZ
Represented By: THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: JOHN J. BOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?