IMMUNEX CORPORATION et al v. SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD.
Plaintiff: HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED and IMMUNEX CORPORATION
Defendant: SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD.
Intervenor: SANDOZ INC., SANDOZ INTERNATIONAL GmbH and SANDOZ GMBH
Case Number: 2:2019cv11755
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Status Conference via telephone held on 6/14/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER - There shall be an in-person conference before the Undersigned on June 25, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 6/14/19. (LM, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re Letter Requesting extension for Plaintiffs to file redactions and the Omnibus Joint Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 6/12/2019. (as, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ORDER The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. to schedule a conference call regarding recent correspondence.(ECF Nos. 7, 19, 20 and 50). SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/12/19. (jl, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 55 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, THOMAS S. FLETCHER and AARON MAURER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (as, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Aaron P. Maurer, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9731357.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
June 10, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas S. Fletcher, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9731314.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting Plaintiffs application for Pro Hac Vice admission of AARON P. MAURER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 6/10/2019. (as, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting Plaintiffs application for Pro Hac Vice admission of THOMAS S. FLETCHER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 6/10/2019. (as, ) Modified on 6/10/2019 (as, ).
June 5, 2019 Filing 50 Letter from Samsung to the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
June 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID I. BERL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (as, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David I Berl to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9717291.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WENDY A. WHITEFORD, J. DREW DIAMOND, DENNIS SMITH, JOSEPH E. LASHER, DAVID T. PRITIKIN, JEFFREY P. KUSHAN, VERNON M. WINTERS, SAMUEL N. TIU and STEVEN J. HOROWITZ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (as, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting #38 Application to admit David I. Berl pro hac vice, etc, filed by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/30/2019. (as, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 47 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven J. Horowitz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704800.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Samuel N. Tiu to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704787.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Vernon M. Winters to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704775.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 44 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey P. Kushan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704751.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David T. Pritikin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704734.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph E. Lasher to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704723.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dennis Smith to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704707.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 40 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice J. Drew Diamond to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704702.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Wendy A. Whiteford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9704652.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 38 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of David I. Berl, Esq. for by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, Esq., #2 Declaration of David I. Berl, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 29, 2019 Filing 37 REDACTION to #33 Brief in Support of Motion,,, by SANDOZ INC., SANDOZ GMBH, SANDOZ INTERNATIONAL GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 36 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Thomas S. Fletcher, Esq. for by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, Esq., #2 Declaration of Thomas S. Fletcher, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 29, 2019 Filing 35 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Aaron P. Maurer, Esq. for by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, Esq., #2 Declaration of Aaron P. Maurer, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (th, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 BRIEF in Support filed by SANDOZ INC., SANDOZ GMBH, SANDOZ INTERNATIONAL GmbH re #32 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Intervene by SANDOZ INC., SANDOZ INTERNATIONAL GmbH, SANDOZ GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for David T. Pritikin, Steven J. Horowitz, Vernon M. Winters, Jeffrey P. Kushan, and Samuel N. Tiu on Consent, etc., re #29 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/28/2019. (th, )
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Wendy A. Whiteford, J. Drew Diamond, Dennis Smith, and Joseph E. Lasher on Consent, etc., re #28 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/28/2019. (th, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 29 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application for David T. Pritikin, Steven J. Horowitz, Vernon M. Winters, Jeffrey P. Kushan, and Samuel N. Tiu on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David T. Pritikin, #2 Certification of Steven J. Horowitz, #3 Certification of Vernon M. Winters, #4 Certification of Jeffrey P. Kushan, #5 Certification of Samuel N. Tiu, #6 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application for Wendy A. Whiteford, J. Drew Diamond, Dennis Smith, and Joseph E. Lasher on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Wendy A. Whiteford, #2 Certification of J. Drew Diamond, #3 Certification of Dennis Smith, #4 Certification of Joseph E. Lasher, #5 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IMMUNEX CORPORATION, AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED. SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD. waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 14, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Letter requesting an extension until 5/28/2019 to file the Joint Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/14/2019. (dam, )
May 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN C. ADKISSON, JONATHAN E. SINGER and ELIZABETH M. FLANAGAN, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth M. Flanagan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9663556.) (BATON, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan E. Singer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9663532.) (BATON, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John C. Adkisson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9663479.) (BATON, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Samsung to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #7 Letter,,. (BATON, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Letter/Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of JOHN C. ADKISSON, ESQ.; JONATHAN E. SINGER, ESQ.; and ELIZABETH M. FLANAGAN, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/13/2019. (dam, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney KEITH J. MILLER and JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN terminated.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD. (BATON, WILLIAM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. enclosing pro hac vice application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Declaration of John C. Adkisson, Esq., #3 Declaration of Jonathan E. Singer, Esq., #4 Declaration of Elizabeth M. Flanagan, Esq., #5 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. MILLER on behalf of SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD. (MILLER, KEITH)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN on behalf of SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES H. CHEVALIER on behalf of HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID E. DELORENZI on behalf of HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 AO120 Patent filed. (jr)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
April 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN M. MAKER on behalf of AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED, IMMUNEX CORPORATION (MAKER, COLLEEN)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED, IMMUNEX CORPORATION (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. HAEFNER on behalf of AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED, IMMUNEX CORPORATION (HAEFNER, MARC)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. identifying Roche Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED, IMMUNEX CORPORATION. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9625468) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IMMUNEX CORPORATION, HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 AO 120)(WALSH, LIZA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMMUNEX CORPORATION et al v. SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: DAVID E. DELORENZI
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMGEN MANUFACTURING, LIMITED
Represented By: MARC D. HAEFNER
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: COLLEEN M. MAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMMUNEX CORPORATION
Represented By: MARC D. HAEFNER
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: COLLEEN M. MAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD.
Represented By: JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SANDOZ INTERNATIONAL GmbH
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SANDOZ GMBH
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?