SILBERSHER et al v. JANNSEN BIOTECH INC. et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEVADA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF MONTANA, Zachary Silbersher, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JANSSEN ONCOLOGY, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Janssen Biotech Inc, JANNSEN BIOTECH INC. and BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2019cv12107
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 63 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against JANNSEN BIOTECH INC., JANSSEN ONCOLOGY, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, filed by ZACHARY SILBERSHER.(GREENBERG, BRUCE)
June 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW039772 for Gordon D. Todd, Esq. (ld, )
June 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Kimberly Leaman, Esq., receipt number TRE103010. (jem)
May 30, 2019 Filing 62 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ANTHONY J. LABRUNA, JR terminated. Attorney ANDREW AUGUSTINE CAFFREY, III for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (ld, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CONSENT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTIONTO DISMISS; that Defendants shall file any reply in further support of their motion to dismiss no later than September 30, 2019; that Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be returnable on October 7, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/30/2019. (ld, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 60 Letter from Jeffrey J. Greenbaum to Magistrate Clark with proposed Consent Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order (Proposed Final))(GREENBAUM, JEFFREY)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that Gordon D. Todd, Esq. and Kimberly Leaman, Esq., are hereby grantedadmission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/22/2019. (ld, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 58 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gordon D. Todd and Kimberly Leaman for by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey J. Greenbaum, #2 Declaration of Gordon D. Todd, #3 Declaration of Kimberly Leaman, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(GREENBAUM, JEFFREY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JANNSEN BIOTECH INC., JANSSEN ONCOLOGY, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (GREENBAUM, JEFFREY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY EDWARD REID on behalf of All Defendants (REID, GREGORY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY J. GREENBAUM on behalf of All Defendants (GREENBAUM, JEFFREY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG on behalf of ZACHARY SILBERSHER (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
May 6, 2019 Filing 53 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
May 3, 2019 Filing 52 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-07250. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 2, 2019 case electronically transmitted to the District of New Jersey. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #30 Motion to Transfer Case. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 50 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 5/3/19 at 10 a.m. PST. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Leaman, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options - CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY 47 (Leaman, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 47 *** PLEASE IGNORE - INCORRECT EVENT USED - SEE DKT #48 *** NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Leaman, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/26/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (cmf, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2019 Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff-Relator Silbersher (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #43 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Zach Silbersher. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 17, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by Zach Silbersher of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel; [Proposed] Order filed by Nicomedes Sy Herrera of Herrera Purdy LLP (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint) filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Nicomedes Sy Herrera of Herrera Purdy LLP (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 4/9/2019) Modified on 4/10/2019 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed by Zach Silbersher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 38 Plaintiff-Relator's Response to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re #33 Notice filed by Zach Silbersher. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Responses due by 3/27/2019. Replies due by 4/11/2019. See #22 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY (re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case) filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 MOTION to Transfer Case. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Zach Silbersher. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #30 MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a)) filed by Zach Silbersher. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicomedes Sy Herrera In Support of Plaintiff-Relator's Opposition to Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON re #30 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Zach Silbersher. (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Request, Request, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in Support of re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-C, #(2) Exhibit D, #(3) Exhibit E, #(4) Exhibit F, #(5) Exhibit G-I, #(6) Exhibit J-R, #(7) Exhibit S-CC, #(8) Exhibit DD-HH)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/11/2019. Replies due by 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Bettinger, #2 Appendix A to Declaration, #3 [Proposed] Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 31 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 filed by Zach Silbersher (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, AND MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support of MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/26/2019. Replies due by 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harman A. Grossman in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Harman A. Grossman, #3 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13014897) filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Todd, Gordon) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #17 Stipulation. Response to Amended Complaint due by 2/25/2019.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13009701.) filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Leaman, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zach Silbersher (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Bettinger on Behalf of Defendants (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Zach Silbersher, Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson. (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 1/9/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zach Silbersher Proof of Service on Johnson & Johnson (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zach Silbersher Proof of Service on Janssen Research & Development, LLC (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zach Silbersher Proof of Service on Janssen Oncology, Inc. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zach Silbersher Proof of Service on Janssen Biotech, Inc. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/24/2018. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention and ORDER to Unseal Case. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/30/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Filed by Zach Silbersher. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Government's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention and ORDER. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/24/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
December 21, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2018 at 1:30 PM in Ronald Dellums Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of: (1) The Federal False Claims Act, 31 U.S.C. Sections 3729-3733; and (2) The False Claims Act of the Plaintiff States, Commonwealths, and the District of Columbia; Jury Trial Demanded against Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt #34611130034). Filed by Zachary Silbersher. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017) Modified on 12/22/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/19/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILBERSHER et al v. JANNSEN BIOTECH INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF VERMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEVADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IOWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF DELAWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MONTANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Silbersher
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JOSEPH R. SAVERI
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF HAWAII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN ONCOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY EDWARD REID
Represented By: JEFFREY J. GREENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: GREGORY EDWARD REID
Represented By: JEFFREY J. GREENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: GREGORY EDWARD REID
Represented By: JEFFREY J. GREENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Biotech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANNSEN BIOTECH INC.
Represented By: GREGORY EDWARD REID
Represented By: JEFFREY J. GREENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?