AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A. v. M/V MEDI ZUOZ
Plaintiff: AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A.
Defendant: M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem and M/V MEDI ZUOZ
Case Number: 2:2019cv12148
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 is adjourned to 8/6/2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 8/2/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/3/2019. (jqb, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 Remark: U.S. Marshal, return warrant of arrest in rem executed, on 5/9/2019. (JB, )
June 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #25 ORDER that the motion for the pro hac vice admission of Michael P. Jones submitted by the Clerk's office on 6/12/2019 is a duplicate of D.E. 24, please disregard. This message is for informational purposes only. (as, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the motion for the pro hac vice admission of Michael P. Jones [D.E. 9] is GRANTED, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/11/2019. (as, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Jones by AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/11/2019. (JB, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Behmke by AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/10/2019. (JB, )
June 9, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #22 Order, submitted by M/V MEDI ZUOZ has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/8/2019. (JB, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER, it is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the undersigned counsel that the time for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed 5/2/2019 is extended up to and including 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/7/2019. (JB, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION extending time to respond to Complaint by M/V MEDI ZUOZ. (NAST, TIMOTHY)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 7/23/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/20/2019. (jqb, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT of Interest in the Vessel (Verified) by M/V MEDI ZUOZ. (NAST, TIMOTHY)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY JAMES NAST on behalf of M/V MEDI ZUOZ (NAST, TIMOTHY)
May 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of appearance submitted by T. Nast on 5/9/2019 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (JB, )
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, it is hereby Ordered, pursuant to Rule E(5)(a) of the Supplemental Rules, that the Warrant for Arrest in Rem to the United States Marshal for the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey (ECF No. 13) (The "Warrant) is hereby stayed upon the giving of the security to AMD in the form of the letter undertaking and it is further Order, that he United States Marshal for the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey shall release the MV/MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances, bunkers, and other property, in rem from its custody, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/9/2019. (JB, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2019. Order releasing the vessel signed. (Court Reporter Mary Jo Monteleone) (ps, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Regarding Release of Vessel by AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 9, 2019 Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Esther Salas. Plaintiff's counsel shall kindly coordinate. (ps, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY JAMES NAST on behalf of M/V MEDI ZUOZ (NAST, TIMOTHY)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued by the Clerk (JB, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Granting #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A. The Clerk is directed to immediately issue a warrant for arrest as filed by AMD in the above-captioned action, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/7/2019. (JB, )
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #4 MOTION to Allow Vessel Movement to Conduct Repairs and Move Within the District by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A.., etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/7/2019. (JB, )
May 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem , #4 MOTION to Allow Vessel Movement to Conduct Repairs and Move Within the District , #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Jones, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Behmke. Motion set for 6/3/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to M/V MEDI ZUOZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Jones by AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph G. Falcone, #2 Certification of Michael P. Jones, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Behmke by AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph G. Falcone, #2 Certification of Peter Behmke, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A. identifying Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Exhibit to #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Proposed Warrant Directing Arrest In Rem by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A. as to M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem. (FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Allow Vessel Movement to Conduct Repairs and Move Within the District by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A. re #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A.. (FALCONE, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9641669), filed by Agencia Maritima Dulce S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FALCONE, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A. v. M/V MEDI ZUOZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGENCIA MARITIMA DULCE S.A.
Represented By: JOSEPH GERARD FALCONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MEDI ZUOZ and her appurtenances bunkers and other property, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MEDI ZUOZ
Represented By: TIMOTHY JAMES NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?