INVENTERGY LBS, LLC v. CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: INVENTERGY LBS, LLC
Defendant: CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12210
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conferencefor 8/13/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/28/2019. (spc, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; It is hereby stipulated by and between Plaintiff and Defendant, through their respective undersigned counsel, that Defendants time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to July 17, 2019; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/17/2019. (sms)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Katherine M. Lieb Requesting the Court So Order the enclosed Stipulation. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order)(LIEB, KATHERINE)
May 30, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CASIO AMERICA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/17/2019. (sms)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE MARGUERITE LIEB on behalf of CASIO AMERICA, INC. (LIEB, KATHERINE)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Casio America, Inc... (LIEB, KATHERINE)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INVENTERGY LBS, LLC. CASIO AMERICA, INC. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A) (sms)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CASIO AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
May 7, 2019 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by INVENTERGY LBS, LLC as to CASIO AMERICA, INC.. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by INVENTERGY LBS, LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INVENTERGY LBS, LLC. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CASIO AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9645209) with JURY DEMAND, filed by INVENTERGY LBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INVENTERGY LBS, LLC v. CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INVENTERGY LBS, LLC
Represented By: STAMATIOS STAMOULIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: KATHERINE MARGUERITE LIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?