ZUPPA v. INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469)
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ZUPPA
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469), ABC, INC. and JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv12507
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(WEINTRAUB, HEIDI)
June 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469). Responses due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Certification OF TIMOTHY R. HOTT, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #3 Exhibit EX. A TO CERTIFICATION OF TIMOTHY R. HOTT, #4 Exhibit EX. B TO CERTIFICATION OF TIMOTHY R. HOTT, #5 Exhibit EX. C TO CERTIFICATION OF TIMOTHY R. HOTT, #6 Text of Proposed Order TO DISMISS)(HOTT, TIMOTHY)
May 15, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469) has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/3/2019. (ld, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 102 (now 469).. (HOTT, TIMOTHY)
May 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469) from SUPERIOR COURT OF ESSEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY, case number ESX L 007400 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9664247), filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY, #2 Exhibit NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL, #3 Exhibit STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(HOTT, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZUPPA v. INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ZUPPA
Represented By: DANIEL GERARD PETOIA MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL 102 (469)
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. HOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?