SEIFERT v. SF&P ADVISORS, INC.

Plaintiff: ERIC SEIFERT
Defendant: SF&P Advisors, Inc. and JOHN DOES 1 TO 5
Case Number: 2:2019cv12770
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 9:19-cv-80877, filed 07/02/2019. (dm )
July 2, 2019 Case extracted via ECF to Southern District of Florida. (mfr)
July 2, 2019 *** Civil Case Terminated. See #11 Order. *** (dam, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. This action be and hereby is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/2/2019. (dam, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/2/2019. (dam, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Frank Derby encl. corrected brief re #7 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Brief re Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (CORRECTED))(DERBY, FRANK)
June 19, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 7/9/19 at 10am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/19/19. (tjg, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SF&P ADVISORS, INC. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (DERBY, FRANK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ERIC SEIFERT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric Seifert)(BOSIN, STEPHEN)
May 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit to #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, by SF&P ADVISORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss or Transfer)(DERBY, FRANK)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SF&P ADVISORS, INC.. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief iso Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification of Frank E. Derby iso Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Derby Certification, #4 Exhibit B to Derby Certification, #5 Exhibit C to Derby Certification, #6 Exhibit D to Derby Certification, #7 Exhibit E to Derby Certification, #8 Exhibit F to Derby Certification, #9 Affidavit of Fred Silberstein iso Motion to Dismiss)(DERBY, FRANK)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by SF&P Advisors, Inc.. (DERBY, FRANK)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SF&P Advisors, Inc.. (DERBY, FRANK)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SF&P Advisors, Inc. from Superior Court of Bergen County, case number BER-L-002788-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9683884), filed by SF&P Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint)(DERBY, FRANK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEIFERT v. SF&P ADVISORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF&P Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: FRANK EDWIN DERBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 TO 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC SEIFERT
Represented By: STEPHEN R. BOSIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?