RIALTO-CAPITOL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. v. BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: RIALTO-CAPITOL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY and BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv12811
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RIALTO-CAPITOL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. re #5 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court (SAWYER, JOHN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY re #5 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certification)(PRUTTING, GEORGE)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY re #5 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(CLARK, PAUL)
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PRUTTING, GEORGE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.(CLARK, PAUL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying International Financial Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CLARK, PAUL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court . (PRUTTING, GEORGE)
June 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of John Randy Sawyer with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certification Certification of Service)(SAWYER, JOHN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RIALTO-CAPITOL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.. (SAWYER, JOHN)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Jeff Merritt, Process Server by RIALTO-CAPITOL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.. (SAWYER, JOHN)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PRUTTING, GEORGE)
May 22, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (sms)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY, A Corporation of the State of Ohio from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY LAW DIVISION HUDSON COUNTY, case number HUD-L-1389-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9686409), filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY, A Corporation of the State of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Certification Petition for Removal, #2 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(PRUTTING, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIALTO-CAPITOL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. v. BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIALTO-CAPITOL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: JOHN RANDY SAWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GEORGE A. PRUTTING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PAUL F. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?