PBA LOCAL 183 et al v. COUNTY OF ESSEX
Plaintiff: PBA LOCAL 183, MICHAEL TESEI, ROBERT SUTTON, STEVEN SALVATORIELLO and CARMELO VINCI
Defendant: COUNTY OF ESSEX
Case Number: 2:2019cv13296
Filed: June 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that counsel for Defendant shall file their cross motion in response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint (in the first case) as well as their initial motion/answer for the second case on or before 7/12/2019; counsel for Plaintiffs shall file Plaintiff's opposition to both of Defendant's filings on or before 7/26/2019; Defendant shall have the right to file a reply in the second action only on or before 8/2/2019; all of the aforementioned documents shall be electronically filed in the first action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/2/2019. (sm)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION that until further Order of the Court, all pleadings in the consolidated action shall be electronically filed in PBA LOCAL 183, DOLORES M. PALADINO AND MARISOL PAGAN V. COUNTY OF ESSEX, Civil Action No. 17-6962 SRC-CLW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/1/2019. (sm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW I.W. BAKER on behalf of COUNTY OF ESSEX (BAKER, MATTHEW)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN on behalf of COUNTY OF ESSEX (EINHORN, KATHLEEN)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA on behalf of COUNTY OF ESSEX (GENOVA, ANGELO)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COUNTY OF ESSEX. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
June 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF ESSEX ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9710389) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL TESEI, PBA LOCAL 183, CARMELO VINCI, STEVEN SALVATORIELLO, ROBERT SUTTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PALMA DELUISI, VALERIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PBA LOCAL 183 et al v. COUNTY OF ESSEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PBA LOCAL 183
Represented By: VALERIE MICHELLE PALMA DELUISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TESEI
Represented By: VALERIE MICHELLE PALMA DELUISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SUTTON
Represented By: VALERIE MICHELLE PALMA DELUISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN SALVATORIELLO
Represented By: VALERIE MICHELLE PALMA DELUISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMELO VINCI
Represented By: VALERIE MICHELLE PALMA DELUISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ESSEX
Represented By: KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN
Represented By: MATTHEW I.W. BAKER
Represented By: ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?