SPINNER CONSULTING LLC v. STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC
Plaintiff: SPINNER CONSULTING LLC
Defendant: STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13471
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan M. Herman; granting #11 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kaleb McNeely. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/8/2019. (dam, )
July 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kaleb McNeely. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mfr)
July 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Herman. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mfr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC. (EWING, BRUCE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kaleb McNeely by STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kaleb McNeely, #2 Certification of Bruce R. Ewing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(EWING, BRUCE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Herman by STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jonathan M. Herman, #2 Certification of Bruce R. Ewing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(EWING, BRUCE)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #8 Stipulation and Proposed Order. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/25/2019. (dam, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC. (EWING, BRUCE)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE R. EWING on behalf of STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC (EWING, BRUCE)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC, filed by SPINNER CONSULTING LLC.(SCILEPPI, LAURA)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
June 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Laura Scileppi. (SCILEPPI, LAURA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by SPINNER CONSULTING LLC as to STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC. (SCILEPPI, LAURA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPINNER CONSULTING LLC. (SCILEPPI, LAURA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9723786) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SPINNER CONSULTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCILEPPI, LAURA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPINNER CONSULTING LLC v. STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC
Represented By: BRUCE R. EWING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPINNER CONSULTING LLC
Represented By: LAURA J. SCILEPPI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?