NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD v. ALAMEDA CENTER FOR REHABILITATION & HEALTHCARE, LLC
Plaintiff: NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
Defendant: ALAMEDA CENTER FOR REHABILITATION & HEALTHCARE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13578
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Granting #6 Letter from Applicant, requesting a voluntary dismissal, etc
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Applicant. (SANTIAGO, SAULO)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Applicant. (SANTIAGO, SAULO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certification on behalf of NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (SANTIAGO, SAULO)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 8/14/2019 02:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion, as to why this Court should not order directing it to comply with the subpoena. Show Cause Response due by 7/25/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/18/2019. (JB, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALAMEDA CENTER FOR REHABILITATION & HEALTHCARE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALAMEDA CENTER FOR REHABILITATION & HEALTHCARE, LLC, filed by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief Memorandum on Points and Authorities, #3 Affidavit Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SANTIAGO, SAULO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD v. ALAMEDA CENTER FOR REHABILITATION & HEALTHCARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
Represented By: SAULO SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAMEDA CENTER FOR REHABILITATION & HEALTHCARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?