CMA CGM S.A. v. BIOMASS PRO, INC.
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Defendant: BIOMASS PRO, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13647
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/26/2019. (ti, )
July 15, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BIOMASS PRO, INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ld, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Default by CMA CGM S.A. against Biomass Pro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Proof of service)(MODICA, ROBERT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Certification of Damages Pursuant to L.R. 201.1(d)(3) on behalf of CMA CGM S.A.. (MODICA, ROBERT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CMA CGM S.A.. BIOMASS PRO, INC. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (MODICA, ROBERT)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit to #1 Complaint (civil cover sheet) by CMA CGM S.A.. (MODICA, ROBERT)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIOMASS PRO, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
June 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by CMA CGM S.A. as to BIOMASS PRO, INC.. (MODICA, ROBERT)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMA CGM S.A.. (MODICA, ROBERT)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BIOMASS PRO, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9735465), filed by CMA CGM S.A..(MODICA, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMA CGM S.A. v. BIOMASS PRO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMASS PRO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Represented By: ROBERT MODICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?