BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. et al v. ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC and BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC. and TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13722
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC. ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; ACTAVIS LLC waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (LOWER, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC (LOWER, J.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
June 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WYETH LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9741805), filed by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. et al v. ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYETH LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?