PANG v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TYLER ROBERT PANG
Defendant: CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC and TRANS UNION, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13874
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/6/2019. (JB, )
August 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2019. (kd)
July 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to ANDREW LEHMANN: $ 150, receipt number NEW040179 (dam, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Defendant's Letter. Local counsel is permitted to appear by telephone at the upcoming conference. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/29/2019. (dam, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from William R. Brown, Counsel For Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (BROWN, WILLIAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 Joint Discovery Plan by TYLER ROBERT PANG.(POLAKOFF, JACOB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC.(STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
July 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to HANS W. LODGE: $ 150, receipt number NEW040128 (dam, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to HANS W. LODGE. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/19/2019. (dam, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER The initial scheduling conference is rescheduled from August 1, 2019 to August 6, 2019, at 11 a.m. Local counsel for the parties, appearing in person, may arrange for lead counsel to participate telephonically in the conference. In the future, all such requests are to be made by letter rather than motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/19/19. (Wettre, Leda)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from JACOB MARC POLAKOFF. (POLAKOFF, JACOB)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Letter requesting the Pro Hac Vice Admission of ANDREW M. LEHMANN. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/18/2019. (dam, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of William R. Brown In Support Of Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Andrew M. Lehmann, #2 Affidavit Of Andrew M. Lehmann, #3 Text of Proposed Order -Consent Order)(BROWN, WILLIAM)
July 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 Joint MOTION. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and for Leave to Appear Telephonically by TYLER ROBERT PANG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(POLAKOFF, JACOB)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/10/2019. (kd)
July 10, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/24/2019. (dam, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to CoreLogic Credco, LLC.. (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC identifying CoreLogic Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN STEINLIGHT on behalf of CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TYLER ROBERT PANG. CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (POLAKOFF, JACOB)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TYLER ROBERT PANG. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (POLAKOFF, JACOB)
June 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 Plaintiff's Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC. (BROWN, WILLIAM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN on behalf of TRANS UNION, LLC (BROWN, WILLIAM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Hans W. Lodge by TYLER ROBERT PANG. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Jacob M. Polakoff, #2 Certification Of Hans W. Lodge, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(POLAKOFF, JACOB)
June 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hans W. Lodge. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hans W. Lodge by TYLER ROBERT PANG. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Hans W. Lodge)(POLAKOFF, JACOB) Modified on 7/19/2019 (dam, ).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
June 17, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9746821) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TYLER ROBERT PANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Trans Union, LLC, #3 Summons Corelogic Credco, LLC)(POLAKOFF, JACOB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PANG v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER ROBERT PANG
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORELOGIC CREDCO, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN STEINLIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?