FISHBEIN v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff: STANLEY HENRY FISHBEIN
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13895
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/25/2019. (jd, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (as, )
June 18, 2019 Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXIS IRENE LEHMANN on behalf of STANLEY HENRY FISHBEIN (LEHMANN, ALEXIS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9747646) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STANLEY HENRY FISHBEIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(MAILMAN, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FISHBEIN v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY HENRY FISHBEIN
Represented By: ALEXIS IRENE LEHMANN
Represented By: MARK D. MAILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?