August v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Jean August
Respondent: ICE Director, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, RONALD P EDWARDS, WARDEN and MATTHEW WHITAKER
Case Number: 2:2019cv13951
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, RONALD P EDWARDS, ICE Director, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, WARDEN, MATTHEW WHITAKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B, Immigration Judge Decision, #3 Exhibit C, August 21, 2018 BIA Decision, #4 Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO ANSWER, within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete answer to said Petition, which responds to the factual and legal allegations of the Petition paragraph by paragraph. Respondents Nielsen, The ICE Director, Whitaker and the United States of Homeland Security are Dismissed with prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/26/2019. (byl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGHAN LEIGH MCCARTHY on behalf of Jean August (MCCARTHY, MEGHAN)
June 19, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton added. (eu, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02983. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 14, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey. (jca)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER OF VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action shall be and hereby is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, Newark Division, and that the seven-day waiting period in Local Civil Rule 83.1 is waived. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/14/2019) (jca)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security, Ronald P. Edwards, ICE Director, Kirstjen Nielsen, Warden, Matthew Whitaker. (Byars, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Zoey Theo Jones on behalf of Jean August (Jones, Zoey)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Ronald P. Edwards, ICE Director, Kirstjen Nielsen, Warden, Matthew Whitaker. (Byars, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Jean August; in response to re: #5 Order. Document filed by Jean August. (sc)
April 16, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Order to Jean August ID No. A079 709 883 REG No. 330894 Hudson County Jail 30-35 Hacksensack Avenue Kearny, NJ 07032. (nb)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Court directs Petitioner to show cause, by filing a written declaration within thirty days with the Court's Pro Se Intake Unit, stating any reason why this petition should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. For Petitioner's convenience, a declaration form is attached to this order. If Petitioner fails to respond, or if his response does not show that venue lies in this district, the Court will transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in Jonna pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/15/2019) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 4/16/2019 (jca).
April 5, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Jean August ID No. A079 709 883 REG No. 330894 Hudson County Jail 30-35 Hacksensack Avenue Kearny, NJ 07032. (vba)
April 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
April 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/5/19) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Jean August. (sac)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jean August. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: August v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE Director
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD P EDWARDS
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW WHITAKER
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jean August
Represented By: Zoey Theo Jones
Represented By: MEGHAN LEIGH MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?