Copperwood Capital LLC v. Health Stream LLC

Plaintiff: Copperwood Capital LLC
Defendant: Health Stream LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13956
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff must show cause by e-filed submission on or before August 15, 2019 properly setting forth the parties citizenship to support diversity jurisdiction in this case. If Plaintiff does not e-file a submission setting forth a sufficient basis for jurisdiction by August 15, 2019, this matter may be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, and the Clerk will close this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 08/01/2019. (lr, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 07/25/2019. (qa, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Health Stream LLC c/o NJ Secretary of State on 7/12/2019, filed by Copperwood Capital LLC. (KAMARIS, KARLEY)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copperwood Capital LLC identifying Copperwood Capital LLC as Corporate Parent.. (KAMARIS, KARLEY)
June 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eu, )
June 19, 2019 Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Health Stream LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Health Stream LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9752498), filed by Copperwood Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAMARIS, KARLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copperwood Capital LLC v. Health Stream LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Stream LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copperwood Capital LLC
Represented By: KARLEY E. KAMARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?