RAMAH v. THE PROVIDENT BANK et al
Plaintiff: NAZREEN RAMAH
Defendant: THE PROVIDENT BANK and DANIELLE WRAY
Case Number: 2:2019cv13985
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED MOTION For Leave of Court to Amend by NAZREEN RAMAH. (dam, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: As requested in DE 11, Defendants may have 28 days after Plaintiff re-files her Motion for Leave to Amend to submit their responsive pleadings.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/30/19. (tjg, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Michael Westwood-Booth. (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint (Dkt. No. 8) is administratively terminated for failure to follow court preferences. Plaintiff shall refile the motion and include a redlined copy of the proposed amended complaint.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/29/19. (tjg, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Letter. (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION For Leave of Court to Amend by NAZREEN RAMAH. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1)(dam, )
July 10, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Counsel Michael Westwood-Booth email is correct as per attorney. (JB, )
July 10, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Clerk's Quality Control Message filed by the Clerk's office on 7/10/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (as, )
July 10, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Notice of Appearance submitted by Michael Westwood-Booth on 7/3/2019 appears to have email address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (as, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH on behalf of All Defendants (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DANIELLE WRAY, THE PROVIDENT BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/30/2019. (th, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (DIANA, MARK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK DIANA on behalf of THE PROVIDENT BANK, DANIELLE WRAY (DIANA, MARK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES RICCOBONO on behalf of All Defendants (RICCOBONO, MICHAEL)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAZREEN RAMAH. THE PROVIDENT BANK served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019; DANIELLE WRAY served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (JB, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE PROVIDENT BANK, DANIELLE WRAY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (as, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE PROVIDENT BANK, DANIELLE WRAY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW039839) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NAZREEN RAMAH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent Form to Receive Documents Electronically)(as, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMAH v. THE PROVIDENT BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAZREEN RAMAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROVIDENT BANK
Represented By: MARK DIANA
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES RICCOBONO
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE WRAY
Represented By: MARK DIANA
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES RICCOBONO
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?