CELGENE CORPORATION v. APOTEX INC.
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Defendant: APOTEX INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13994
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT LLOYD GREENFELD on behalf of APOTEX INC. (GREENFELD, ROBERT)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by WENDI OPPER UZAR on behalf of APOTEX INC. (UZAR, WENDI)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/5/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/26/2019. (kd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APOTEX INC. identifying Apotex Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SCHOENBERG, ROBERT)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by APOTEX INC..(SCHOENBERG, ROBERT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CELGENE CORPORATION. APOTEX INC. waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Attached Complaint) (dam, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to APOTEX INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (MOSES, DAVID)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM)
June 21, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APOTEX INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9756115), filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELGENE CORPORATION v. APOTEX INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX INC.
Represented By: ROBERT LLOYD GREENFELD
Represented By: ROBERT J. SCHOENBERG
Represented By: WENDI OPPER UZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?