REBNER v. NEW YORK SUSQUEHANNA & WESTERN RAILWAY CORP. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT REBNER
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, INC and NEW YORK SUSQUEHANNA & WESTERN RAILWAY CORP.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14033
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT REBNER. NEW YORK SUSQUEHANNA & WESTERN RAILWAY CORP. waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , filed by ROBERT REBNER. (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, INC, NEW YORK SUSQUEHANNA & WESTERN RAILWAY CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ on behalf of ROBERT REBNER (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
June 21, 2019 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9757687) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROBERT REBNER.(OLLEY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REBNER v. NEW YORK SUSQUEHANNA & WESTERN RAILWAY CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT REBNER
Represented By: MICHAEL J. OLLEY
Represented By: LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK SUSQUEHANNA & WESTERN RAILWAY CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?