UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MYCEK et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: LINDA VENNIK, BOROUGH OF FRANKLIN LAKES, JOHN A MYCEK, SR, SONJA VENNIK GREENTHALER, CLEMENTE ENTERPRISES LLC, TOWNSHIP OF WAYNE, JOSEPH CLEMENTE and LINDA MYCEK
Case Number: 2:2019cv14115
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SONJA VENNIK GREENTHALER for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mfr)
August 6, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LINDA VENNIK for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mfr)
August 6, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TOWNSHIP OF WAYNE for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mfr)
August 6, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FRANKLIN LAKES for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mfr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Default by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against Sonja Vennik Greenthaler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TOBIN, OLGA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Default by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against Linda Vennik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TOBIN, OLGA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Default by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against Township of Wayne. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TOBIN, OLGA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Default by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against Franklin Lakes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TOBIN, OLGA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by JOSEPH CLEMENTE.(dam, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JOHN A MYCEK, SR waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (TOBIN, OLGA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. TOWNSHIP OF WAYNE served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (TOBIN, OLGA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. SONJA VENNIK GREENTHALER served on 7/6/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (TOBIN, OLGA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. LINDA VENNIK served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (TOBIN, OLGA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. CLEMENTE ENTERPRISES LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (TOBIN, OLGA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. BOROUGH OF FRANKLIN LAKES served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (TOBIN, OLGA)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF FRANKLIN LAKES, CLEMENTE ENTERPRISES LLC, JOHN A MYCEK, SR, TOWNSHIP OF WAYNE, LINDA VENNIK, SONJA VENNIK GREENTHALER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (as, )
June 24, 2019 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF FRANKLIN LAKES, CLEMENTE ENTERPRISES LLC, JOHN A MYCEK, SR, TOWNSHIP OF WAYNE, LINDA VENNIK, SONJA VENNIK GREENTHALER, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(TOBIN, OLGA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MYCEK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA VENNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF FRANKLIN LAKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A MYCEK, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONJA VENNIK GREENTHALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEMENTE ENTERPRISES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF WAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH CLEMENTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA MYCEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: OLGA L. TOBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?