COBY v. NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORP., et al INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MINDY COBY
Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORP., JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 and ABC COMPANIES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv14120
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Settlement Conference from 11/13/2019 to 11/27/2019 at 9:30 am in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/8/2019. (kd)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Telephone Conference from 11/7/2019 to 11/13/2019 at 2:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/8/2019. (kd)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/7/2019. (sms)
August 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Scheduling Conference held on 8/7/2019. (kd)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - Per counsel's request, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 11:30 am is rescheduled to 8/7/2019 at 10:30 am in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/22/2019. (kd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Brett Anders. (ANDERS, BRETT)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/7/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/12/2019. (kd)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORP., NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(ANDERS, BRETT)
July 2, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORP., NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/12/2019. (th, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CARLYLE WAYNE EDWARDS-BALFOUR on behalf of NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (EDWARDS-BALFOUR, CARLYLE)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Compliance by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (ANDERS, BRETT)
June 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying National General Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (ANDERS, BRETT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (ANDERS, BRETT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of Essex County, case number ESX-L-003856-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9761402), filed by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ANDERS, BRETT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COBY v. NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORP., et al INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRETT M. ANDERS
Represented By: CARLYLE WAYNE EDWARDS-BALFOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORP.
Represented By: BRETT M. ANDERS
Represented By: CARLYLE WAYNE EDWARDS-BALFOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY COBY
Represented By: KATHRYN K. MCCLURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?