ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. COOPER LIGHTING LLC
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and THE COUNTY OF UNION
Defendant: COOPER LIGHTING LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv14164
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee in the amount of $ 300.00 received as to Rebecca R. Corson and Jonathan T. Barton, receipt number TRE104534 (km)
July 30, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
July 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 10/7/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/28/2019. (jqb, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE COUNTY OF UNION, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Zurich Insurance Company Ltd as Corporate Parent.. (GONNELLA, CHRISTOPHER)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Letter and #5 Defendant's Letter requesting the Pro Hac Vice admission of REBECCA R. CORSON, ESQ. and JONATHAN T. BARTON, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/27/2019. (dam, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from for Pro Hac Application. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LOCK, JOHN)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LOCK, JOHN)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by COOPER LIGHTING LLC.(LOCK, JOHN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. BONNER on behalf of COOPER LIGHTING LLC (BONNER, MICHAEL)
June 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COOPER LIGHTING LLC identifying Eaton Corporation, PLC as Corporate Parent.. (LOCK, JOHN)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPER LIGHTING LLC from UNION COUNTY, case number UNN-L-1740-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9765642), filed by COOPER LIGHTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(LOCK, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. COOPER LIGHTING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN GONNELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE COUNTY OF UNION
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN GONNELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER LIGHTING LLC
Represented By: JOHN P. LOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?