UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PAREKH
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: PARIND PAREKH
Case Number: 2:2019cv14467
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. PARIND PAREKH waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (TOBIN, OLGA)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PARIND PAREKH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
June 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARIND PAREKH, filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(TOBIN, OLGA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARIND PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: OLGA L. TOBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?