U.S. WIRE & CABLE CORPORATION v. WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Plaintiff: U.S. WIRE & CABLE CORPORATION
Defendant: WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14473
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
2 Judge: William H Walls
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (ANANIA, MARK)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dennis P. Ogden to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9892085.) (ANANIA, MARK)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian J. Laurenzo to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9892067.) (ANANIA, MARK)
August 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Stay , Transfer, or Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay , Transfer, or Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Stay, Transfer, or Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration of Mark H. Anania, #3 Exhibit A to Anania Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Anania Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Anania Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Anania Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Anania Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Anania Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Anania Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Anania Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Anania Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Anania Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Anania Declaration, #14 Declaration of Brian J. Laurenzo, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(ANANIA, MARK)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DENIIS P. OGDEN AND BRIAN J. LAURENZO; counsel shall make payment to the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $150; and make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/8/2019. (sm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admissions of Dennis P. Ogden and Brian J. Laurenzo for by WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mark H. Anania, #2 Certification of Dennis P. Ogden, #3 Certification of Brian J. Laurenzo, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ANANIA, MARK)
July 29, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Extension to time to answer filed by WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/13/2019. (byl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION/PETITION for Local Rule 6.1(b) Clerk's Extension to Answer for by WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (ANANIA, MARK)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO on behalf of WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC. (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK H. ANANIA on behalf of WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC. (ANANIA, MARK)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Esther Salas for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/26/2019. (ti, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. WIRE & CABLE CORPORATION. WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (RODRIGUES, DAVID)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (jr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
June 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by U.S. Wire & Cable Corporation AO120 Patent/Trademark Form (RODRIGUES, DAVID)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Wire & Cable Corporation. (RODRIGUES, DAVID)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by U.S. Wire & Cable Corporation as to Weems Industries, Inc.. (RODRIGUES, DAVID)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Weems Industries, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9780329) with JURY DEMAND, filed by U.S. Wire & Cable Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(RODRIGUES, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. WIRE & CABLE CORPORATION v. WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. WIRE & CABLE CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID RODRIGUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEEMS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Represented By: MARK H. ANANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?