BYFIELD v. BARR et al
Petitioner: NICOLE STACY ANN BYFIELD
Respondent: DIRECTOR RONALD EDWARDS, WILLAIM B. BARR, DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and PAULO CORREIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv14608
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #5 Order, submitted by RONALD EDWARDS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/12/2019. (JB, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, that Respondent's time to file an answer to the habeas petition filed by Petitioner in the above-captioned matter is extended until 9/12/2019 and it is further Ordered that Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the habeas Petition within 30 days after the answer is filed. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/22/2019. (JB,)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Request for Extension of Time. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for RONALD EDWARDS added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting #1 # 1 Application IFP. It is further Ordered that respondents, KIRSTJEN NIELSEL, WILLAIM B. BARR and PAULO CORREIA are dismissed with prejudice and that the Clerk shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon the lone remaining respondents, Ronald Edwards, by regular mail, with all costs of service advanced by the United States, etc terminated.. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/8/2019. (JB, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Petition Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Envelope)(JB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BYFIELD v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DIRECTOR RONALD EDWARDS
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLAIM B. BARR
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PAULO CORREIA
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NICOLE STACY ANN BYFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?