JUSTINO v. BARR et al
Petitioner: FERNANDA SILVA JUSTINO
Respondent: WILLIAM B. BARR, RONALD EDWARDS, PAULO CORREIA and KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Case Number: 2:2019cv14609
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for WILLIAM B. BARR,ENES HAJDARPASIC for PAULO CORREIA,ENES HAJDARPASIC for RONALD EDWARDS,ENES HAJDARPASIC for KIRSTJEN NIELSEN added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to FERNANDO SILVA JUSTINO (dam, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Fernanda Silva Justino (Attachments: #1 NEF) (vm )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER, that the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon Ronald Edwards, by regular mail, and it is further that the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office as the following email address:USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov and that, within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete answer, etc.. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/31/2019. (JB, ) .
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER, that the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon Ronald Edwards by regular mail and with all costs of service advanced by the United States. It is further Ordered that the Clerk shall forward a copy of the petition and this order to Chief, Civil Division, United States attorney's Office at email USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov;. and it is further order that within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete answer, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/25/2019. (JB, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by FERNANDA SILVA JUSTINO. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Envelope)(lag, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUSTINO v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM B. BARR
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD EDWARDS
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PAULO CORREIA
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FERNANDA SILVA JUSTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?