SWEENEY v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT SWEENEY
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES, INC., WYETH LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, MERCK & CO INC. d/b/a MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, JILL DOE SELLERS 1-10, TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC., ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, PFIZER, INC., WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHN DOE MANUFACTURERS 1-10, ASTRAZENECA LP,, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC. and TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
In Re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Case Number: 2:2019cv14664
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LOREN HOWARD BROWN on behalf of PFIZER, INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES, INC. (BROWN, LOREN)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LOREN HOWARD BROWN on behalf of PFIZER, INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES, INC. (BROWN, LOREN)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. LILLY on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (LILLY, JEFFREY)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of MERCK & CO INC. d/b/a MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION (HINDY, GREGORY)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP,, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP (HINDY, GREGORY)
July 5, 2019 Member Case Direct File on 7/2/19, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (gh, )
July 5, 2019 For all Case Management Orders #click here (gh, )
July 2, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA LP, from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division Bergen County, case number BER-L-004148-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9789374), filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA LP,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Notice of Filing of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Statement of Filing and Service of Removal, #7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Certificate of Service)(MANTELL, NATALIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SWEENEY v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Represented By: JEFFREY R. LILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Represented By: LOREN HOWARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Represented By: LOREN HOWARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO INC. d/b/a MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL DOE SELLERS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By: NATALIE HELENE MANTELL
Represented By: GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Represented By: LOREN HOWARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Represented By: LOREN HOWARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE MANUFACTURERS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA LP,
Represented By: NATALIE HELENE MANTELL
Represented By: GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Represented By: JEFFREY R. LILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Represented By: JEFFREY R. LILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SWEENEY
Represented By: JAMES DOUGLAS BARGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?