FREEMAN et al v. MURPHY et al
Plaintiff: PETER BERNSTEIN, JEAN-PAUL WEG, LLC D/B/A THE WINE CELLARAGE, LARS NEUBOHN, JUDY FREEMAN, ROBERT FREEMAN and JEAN-PAUL WEG, LLC
Defendant: PHILIP D. MURPHY, JAMES GRAZIANO and GURBIR SINGH GREWAL
Case Number: 2:2019cv14716
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Gary S. Redish re #10 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (REDISH, GARY)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/27/2019. (spc, )
August 13, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #8 Letter submitted by GURBIR SINGH GREWAL, JAMES GRAZIANO, PHILIP D. MURPHY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/30/2019. (vm)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER extending defendant's time to answer or otherwise move to Monday, September 30,2019. re #8 Letter. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/9/2019. (vm, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Kimberley Wilson and Michael Cohen. (WILSON, KIMBERLEY)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Michael J Cohen in support of informal pro hac vice application on consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael J. Cohen in support of pro hac vice application, #2 Certification of Messrs. Tanford, Epstein, and Beutel in support of pro hac vice application (with certificates of good standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, MICHAEL)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY S. REDISH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (REDISH, GARY)
July 30, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order for an Extension of time to Answer move or otherwise respond has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/15/2019. (byl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to all Defendants.. (WILSON, KIMBERLEY)
July 29, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Clerk's Order for Extension of Time to File filed by KIMBERLEY M. WILSON on 07/25/2019 was submitted incorrectly as an Answer. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application USING - Civil-Other Filings-Other Documents-Application for Clerk Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (byl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Extension of Time to Reply ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(WILSON, KIMBERLEY)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on All Defendants on July 11, 2019, filed by ROBERT FREEMAN., SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT FREEMAN. All Defendants. (COHEN, MICHAEL)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAMES GRAZIANO, GURBIR SINGH GREWAL, PHILIP D. MURPHY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
July 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9791909), filed by JUDY FREEMAN, ROBERT FREEMAN, PETER BERNSTEIN, LARS NEUBOHN, JEAN-PAUL WEG, LLC D/B/A THE WINE CELLARAGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COHEN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEMAN et al v. MURPHY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP D. MURPHY
Represented By: KIMBERLEY M. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES GRAZIANO
Represented By: KIMBERLEY M. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR SINGH GREWAL
Represented By: KIMBERLEY M. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER BERNSTEIN
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Represented By: GARY S. REDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN-PAUL WEG, LLC D/B/A THE WINE CELLARAGE
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARS NEUBOHN
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Represented By: GARY S. REDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY FREEMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Represented By: GARY S. REDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FREEMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Represented By: GARY S. REDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN-PAUL WEG, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Represented By: GARY S. REDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?